Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIn Re Application of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press Access to Certain Sealed Court Records
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2017cv00169
Date Filed2017-01-23
Date Closed2017-06-27
JudgeJudge Richard D. Bennett
PlaintiffIn Re Application of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press Access to Certain Sealed Court Records
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-231Application of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press Access to Certain Sealed Court Records (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-232Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 1 Application of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press Access to Certain Sealed Court Records.(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Filing fee: $ 47.00, receipt number 84637029136 (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-133Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Application by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-144ORDER granting 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Application. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/14/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-03-075Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-096ORDER granting 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/9/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-077Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-078ORDER granting 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/7/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-05-089MOTION to Unseal by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0810-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion to Unseal by United States of America re 9 MOTION to Unseal (Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0811MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion to Unseal by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1812ORDER granting 9 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/18/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-1813ORDER granting 11 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/18/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2414Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2415ORDER granting 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/24/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-2316RESPONSE re 1 MOTION Application for Public Access to Certain Sealed Documents filed by United States of America.(Marzullo, Kelly) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-26Telephone Status Conference held on 6/26/2017 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. NOT on the record. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2617NOTICE by In Re Application of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press Access to Certain Sealed Court Records re 1 MOTION, 16 Response Submission of Proposed Order (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2718ORDER GRANTING 1 Application of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press for Public Access to Certain Sealed Court Records; UNSEALING the 9 miscellaneous cases identified in Exhibit 1 to ECF 10.; DISMISSING case w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/26/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff