Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGrynberg et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv00723
Date Filed2017-01-31
Date Closed2018-02-05
JudgeJudge William H. Pauley, III
PlaintiffJack J. Grynberg
PlaintiffGrynberg Petroleum Company
Case DescriptionJack Grynberg and Grynberg Petroleum Company submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning U.S. v. Giffen. The request was referred to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys, which denied the request under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Grynberg appealed, arguing that he was only interested in public records filed as part of the case. EOUSA opened a new request for public records, but later denied it on the basis that there were no public records in the case. Grynberg appealed again and his request was remanded to EOUSA for a further search. On remand, EOUSA requested a fee payment of $5,920, which Grynberg provided. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Grynberg filed suit. The case was originally filed in October 2016 in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado, the jurisdiction in which Grynberg and his company are located. However, the case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, where Grynberg's law firm is located.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S Department of Justice
AppealSecond Circuit 18-370
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [66]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-241COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5212400)Attorney Daniel Louis Abrams added to party Jack J. Grynberg(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Louis Abrams added to party Grynberg Petroleum Co.(pty:pla), filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Co..(Abrams, Daniel) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-242Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (amenz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-243Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (amenz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-254SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Justice re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company. (Abrams, Daniel) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-255MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-256CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-02628-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-257Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-258SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Justice by Plaintiffs Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company. (Abrams, Daniel) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-259ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 4 Summons Request, 8 Summons Request filed by attorney Daniel Abrams. The document is incorrect. Please use the proper document REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2610MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/26/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2611SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-3012NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian J. Kellogg on behalf of U.S. Department of JusticeAttorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft) (Kellogg, Ian) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-3013ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Justice.(Kellogg, Ian) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-0114MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/1/2016. Consent Form due by 12/13/2016. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-1315CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company All parties consent.. (Abrams, Daniel) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-1316ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Upon consent of the parties evidenced by Docket Entry #15, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2(d) and 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/13/16. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-1317Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company. (Abrams, Daniel) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-2018COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2016. ORDERED: The defendants have until 1/9/2017 to make a decision regarding mass exclusions to the 5,000 documents as discussed on the record. ORDERED: The defendants have until 2/24/2017 to designate those documents that are to be excluded as discussed on the record. ORDERED: The remaining documents are to be produced on or before 4/17/2017. ORDERED: Status Conference set for 1/23/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Status Conference set for 2/21/2017 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Status Conference set for 3/15/2017 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2019SCHEDULING ORDER For FOIA ACTION: by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/2016. (slibi, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2017-01-0620MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Initial Production/Exemption Determinations by Defendant U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kellogg, Ian) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-1021MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendants Motion for Ten-Day Extension of Time to Make Initial Production/Exemption Determinations by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/10/2017. Defendant shall make its initial production/exemption determination on or before 1/19/2017. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-2322COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/23/2017. Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Status Conference set for 1/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2723COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/27/2017. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2724NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shiwon Choe on behalf of U.S. Department of JusticeAttorney Shiwon Choe added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft) (Choe, Shiwon) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2725Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York by Defendant U.S. Department of Justice. (Choe, Shiwon) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-3026ORDER granting 25 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/30/2017. (slibi, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/31/2017.] (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3127CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Colorado; Case Number: 1:16-cv-02628. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31Case Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3128NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: The Initial Pretrial Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Thursday, February 16, 2017, at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 14-C, 500 Pearl Street, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. The submission of the proposed civil case management plan (attached & can be found on the SDNY website) and joint letter, pursuant to Rule 6G of Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (attached & can also be found on the SDNY website), due two business days prior to the conference. The joint letter should be filed on ECF in accordance with the ECF filing instructions as opposed to e-mailing the documents to the Court. The proposed civil case management plan should be filed on ECF as an "exhibit / proposed order" to the joint letter. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov (Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Individual Practices, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(mov) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3129NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Bretz on behalf of U.S Department of Justice. (Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3130STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-CR-404. Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company.(Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-02Calendar Entry *Date Change*: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on February 16, 2017 is adjourned to: Thursday, March 2, 2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl St, before Judge Paul A. Crotty. The joint letter and proposed civil case management plan to be filed by: Tuesday, February 28, 2017. The adjournment was on consent - AUSA Bretz out of town on 2/16/17. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY (reset via e-mail communication by: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-0431LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Daniel L. Abrams dated 02/04/2017 re: Grynberg v. DOJ 17 Civ. 723: Case Assignment. Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company.(Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2017)
2017-02-15NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-1732LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 2/17/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2133ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 02/21/2017) (ap) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2134ORDER granting 32 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 2/17/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. Application granted. The December 20, 2016 Scheduling Order is vacated. The parties are directed to submit a revised proposed scheduling order by March 1, 2017. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/21/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2335FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference (in regard to submission of pre-conference Rule 26(f) report) addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 2/23/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) Modified on 3/17/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-0136PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT (Proposed Scheduling Order) . Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-0337SCHEDULING ORDER granting 35 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court adopts the portions of the parties' proposed scheduling order (ECF No. 36) up to and including the May 5, 2017 production deadline. Status Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/3/2017) (cla) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/3/2017. (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-03-0638LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Daniel L. Abrams dated March 6, 2017 re: Case Relatedness. Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company.(Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-05-0339LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of 5/5/17 Production Deadline addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 5/3/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-0440ORDER granting 39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The production deadline is extended to August 3, 2017. The status conference scheduled for May 25, 2017 is adjourned to August 11, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/4/2017) (ras) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-04Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (ras) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-08-1041LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 8/10/17 re: 8/11/17 Conference. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1042LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Daniel L. Abrams dated August 10, 2017 re: Grynberg v. DOJ Tomorrow's Conference. Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company.(Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1143SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for a status conference on August 11, 2017, the Court adopts the following schedule on consent; 1. Defendant shall file its motion by September 27, 2017. 2. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition by November 7, 2017. 3. Defendant shall file any reply by November 21, 2017. 4. The parties shall appear for oral argument on December 8, 2017 at 12:30 p.m. (Motions due by 9/27/2017. Responses due by 11/7/2017 Replies due by 11/21/2017. Oral Argument set for 12/8/2017 at 12:30 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/11/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Status Conference held on 8/11/2017. (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-2544LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 9/25/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2545ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted in part and denied in part. This Court presided over the Giffen case and does not need 25 pages of procedural history. The Government is afforded a total of 35 pages for its motion. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/25/2017) (cf) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2746MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2747MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2748DECLARATION of Tricia Francis in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-V)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2749DECLARATION of Darian Hodge in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2750DECLARATION of Colette Ford in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-2751LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages From 25 to 35 addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Daniel L. Abrams dated October 27, 2017. Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company.(Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-2752ORDER granting 51 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/27/2017) (mro) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-0753MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jack J. Grynberg, Grynberg Petroleum Company. (Abrams, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-1854LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 11/18/17. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 11/18/2017)
2017-11-2055ORDER granting 54 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/20/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-2156REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2157DECLARATION of Darian Hodge in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2158DECLARATION of Emily Bretz in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2159LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 11/21/2017 re: Motion for Summary Judgment Filings List. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2160TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 8/11/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2161NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 8/11/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-0462LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Emily Bretz dated 12/4/17 re: Oral Argument. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-0463MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 62 Letter filed by U.S Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/4/2017) (mro) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Oral Argument held on 12/8/2017 re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by U.S Department of Justice. (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-0564TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/8/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-0565NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-02-0166OPINION & ORDER re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S Department of Justice: For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion for summary judgment dismissing this FOIA action is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and mark this case as closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/1/2018) (jwh) Modified on 2/1/2018 (jwh). (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 66 Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jwh) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-0567CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 66 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of U.S Department of Justice against Grynberg Petroleum Company, Jack J. Grynberg. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated February 1, 2018, the Government's motion for summary judgment dismissing this FOIA action is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/05/2018) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff