Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMICHAEL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00197
Date Filed2017-01-31
Date Closed2018-09-28
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffGERALD EUGENE MICHAEL
Case DescriptionGerald Michael, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records about himself. The agency disclosed some records. Michael filed an administrative appeal and the agency's denial was upheld. Michael also submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records about himself. The agency denied the request. After Michael appealed, the agency upheld the denial. Michael then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-01-31SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (jf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-01-312MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL (jf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-01-313PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL (jf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-01-314ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $32.16 from Prison Account of Gerald Eugene Michael and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 01/31/2017. (jf) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-085SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/27/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/27/2017. (jf) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/21/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/20/2017. (zjf) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-208NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-209MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-21MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant's shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/21/17. (DMK) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/19/2017. (jth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-06-1910MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendant's motion for an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint. Defendant shall file its answer and proposed briefing schedule on or before August 18, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/20/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its answer and proposed briefing schedule on or before 8/18/2017. (jth) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-08-1811MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-21MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for extension of time is GRANTED and that defendant's answer to plaintiff's complaint is due by August 25, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by October 19, 2017, plaintiff's opposition is due by December 8, 2017, and defendant's reply is due by January 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/21/17. (DMK) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 8/25/2017; Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 10/19/2017; Plaintiff's Opposition is due by 12/8/2017; Defendant's Reply is due by 1/23/2018. (jth) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2512ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) Modified on 8/25/2017 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2513ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-25NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Answer to Complaint was entered in error at the request of counsel and counsel was refiled as pleading 13 . (zrdj) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-10-1314MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendants motion for summary judgment is due by November 21, 2017, plaintiffs opposition is due by January 8, 2018, and defendants reply is due by February 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/17. (DMK) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-2515STATUS REPORT by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL. (td) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-2516MOTION to Clarify by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL; (See docket entry no. 15 to view) (td) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-27MINUTE ORDER. In response to plaintiff's status report, the Court advises that defendant did file an answer 13 to the complaint on August 25, 2017, but that no reply to that pleading is required under the rules. Defendant has indicated that it plans to file a dispositive motion, a motion for summary judgment, which is now due on November 21, 2017. According to the schedule set by the Court on October 18, 2017, plaintiff's opposition to that motion will be due on January 8, 2018. When defendant's motion is filed in November, the Court will issue an additional order advising plaintiff of the rules concerning motions for summary judgment, the opposition he may file, and the potential consequences if he does not oppose the motion. In other words, there is nothing due from the plaintiff at this time, and the plaintiff can expect to receive more instructions from the Court when he does have to file something. Plaintiff will also be free to seek an extension of time if he needs it, but he should try to file any motion for an extension at least two days before the pleading is actually due. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/27/17. (DMK) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-27MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Clarify in light of the minute order issued on this date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/27/17. (DMK) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 1/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-2017MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-21MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by November 22, 2017; plaintiff's opposition is due by January 9, 2018; and defendant's reply is due by February 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/21/17. (DMK) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2218MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-2719Order advising plaintiff to respond by January 9, 2018, to defendant's motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment for the defendant based solely on defendant's asserted facts (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/27/17.(ah) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-2920MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL (jf) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is ordered that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 2/23/2018, and defendant's reply is due by 4/9/2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/3/18. (DMK) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-02-1521RESPONSE re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD EUGENE MICHAEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-04-0922REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-09-2723MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 18 defendant's motion for summary judgment; denying [21-1] plaintiff's motion for discovery. See document for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/27/2018. (dm) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2724ORDER granting 18 defendant's motion for summary judgment; denying [21-1] plaintiff's motion for discovery. See document for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/27/2018. (dm) Modified on 9/27/2018 (dm). (Entered: 09/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar