Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCKINLEY v. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00256
Date Filed2017-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffVERN MCKINLEY
Case DescriptionVern McKinley submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Reserve for records concerning the borrowing rates of individual institutions through the Federal Reserve from 1918-1921. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told McKinley several times that it would need more time to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, McKinley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-081COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4835072) filed by VERN MCKINLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Federal Reserve System)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-08Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-133GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM served on 2/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff