Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleParham v. United States Social Security Administration
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv00531
Date Filed2017-02-13
Date Closed2017-03-07
JudgeJudge Richard W. Story
PlaintiffJames Clifford Parham
Case DescriptionJames Parham filed suit against the Social Security Administration, alleging that he had been unconstitutionally denied benefits because of his exercise of this First Amendment rights. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUnited States Social Security Administration
AppealEleventh Circuit 17-11997
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-131APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Clifford Parham. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint and Request for Injunction, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Submitted to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bdb) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-132ORDER granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at the present time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/13/17. (jpa) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-133COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction filed by James Clifford Parham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-14Submission of 3 Complaint for frivolity determination, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (jpa) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-14Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to James Clifford Parham re 2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-16Submission of 3 Complaint re request for injunction, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (jpa) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-174MOTION for Reconsideration re 2 Order by James Clifford Parham. (bdb) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-075Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by James Clifford Parham. (bdb) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-076Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) without prejudice. (bdb) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-07Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-07Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to James Clifford Parham re 6 Clerks Entry of Dismissal. (bdb) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff