Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDitech Financial, LLC et al v. Henley
DistrictSouthern District of Mississippi
CityNorthern Jackson
Case Number3:2017cv00111
Date Filed2017-02-17
Date Closed2017-10-25
JudgeDistrict Judge William H. Barbour, Jr
PlaintiffDitech Financial, LLC
formerly known as Green Tree Servicing, LLC
PlaintiffWalter Investment Management Corp.
PlaintiffBest Insurors, Inc.
PlaintiffMid State Capital, LLC
PlaintiffMid State Trust II
PlaintiffMid State Trust III
PlaintiffMid State Trust IV
PlaintiffMid State Trust V
PlaintiffMid State Trust VI
PlaintiffMid State Trust VII
PlaintiffMid State Trust VIII
PlaintiffMid State Trust IX
PlaintiffMid State Trust X
PlaintiffMid State Trust XI
PlaintiffWilmington Trust Company
PlaintiffMid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust
PlaintiffMid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust
PlaintiffMid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust
PlaintiffMid-State Capital Trust 2010-I
Case DescriptionDitech Financial brought suit to settle claims that James Henley might have against the Estate of Barbara Brilbro. This involves bankruptcy and is not a FOIA case
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantJames L. Henley, Jr. former Chapter 13 Trustee, for and on behalf of the Bankruptcy Estate of Barbara Ann Bilbro
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-171COMPLAINT for ORDER PURSUANT TO 9 USC 4 and INJUNCITIVE RELIEF against James L. Henley, Jr ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643043546), filed by Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust VIII, Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Trust VI, Wilmington Trust Company, Mid State Trust V, Best Insurors, Inc., Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) Modified on 3/1/2017 (cwl). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-172Summons Issued as to James L. Henley, Jr. (cwl) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-03-013ATTACHMENT re 1 Complaint,,, Amended Civil Cover Sheet Regarding Related Cases by Best Insurors, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid State Trust II, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust V, Mid State Trust VI, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Trust VIII, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Wilmington Trust Company (Stone, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-05-014ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by James L. Henley, Jr.(Kirschberg, Jason) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-105SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust VIII, Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Trust VI, Wilmington Trust Company, Mid State Trust V, Best Insurors, Inc., Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust II James L. Henley, Jr served on 4/11/2017, answer due 5/2/2017. (Stone, Adam) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-06-236Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-23Reset Hearing: The Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 7/31/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order. (AB) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-307MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Best Insurors, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid State Trust II, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust V, Mid State Trust VI, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Trust VIII, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Wilmington Trust Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Sales Contract, # 2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note and Deed of Trust, # 3 Exhibit C - Green Tree Certificate of Merger, # 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Jeanetta M. Brown, # 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Jeanetta M. Brown on Best Insurors, Inc, # 6 Exhibit F - Ditech Certificate of Merger)(Stone, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-308MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Best Insurors, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid State Trust II, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust V, Mid State Trust VI, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Trust VIII, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Wilmington Trust Company (Stone, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-05TEXT ONLY ORDER staying proceedings. A Motion to Compel Arbitration 7 has been filed. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), proceedings in this matter, including discovery, are stayed pending briefing and ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/5/2017 (HM) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05NOTICE of CANCELLED Calendar Setting. In light of the Text Only Order Staying Proceedings entered 7/5/2017, the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo is hereby CANCELLED. (AB) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-129Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by James L. Henley, Jr (Kirschberg, Jason) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-12TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to Motion to Compel Arbitration due on or before 7/21/17. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge William H. Barbour, Jr on 7/12/17 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-2110NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell D. Thomas on behalf of James L. Henley, Jr (Thomas, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2111RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by James L. Henley, Jr (Thomas, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2412NOTICE of Appearance by Kaytie M. Pickett on behalf of Best Insurors, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid State Trust II, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust V, Mid State Trust VI, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Trust VIII, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Wilmington Trust Company (Pickett, Kaytie) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2813Rebuttal re 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Best Insurors, Inc., Ditech Financial, LLC, Mid State Capital, LLC, Mid State Trust II, Mid State Trust III, Mid State Trust IV, Mid State Trust IX, Mid State Trust V, Mid State Trust VI, Mid State Trust VII, Mid State Trust VIII, Mid State Trust X, Mid State Trust XI, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2004-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2005-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Corporation 2006-1 Trust, Mid-State Capital Trust 2010-I, Walter Investment Management Corp., Wilmington Trust Company (Stone, Adam) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-10-2514OPINION AND ORDER dismissing 7 Motion to Compel and dismissing this case. Signed by District Judge William H. Barbour, Jr on 10/25/17 (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-2515ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Barbour, Jr on 10/25/17 (PKM) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff