Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKOLBUSZ v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00319
Date Filed2017-02-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffROBERT KOLBUSZ
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-171COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616083148) filed by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-17SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (jf) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-172MOTION to list post office box by ROBERT KOLBUSZ (jf) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-063SUPPLEMENT to re 1 Complaint filed by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. (jf) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting 2 motion to list Post Office Box for service of process. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/9/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-244MOTION to Compel by ROBERT KOLBUSZ (jf) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-05MINUTE ORDER granting 4 plaintiff's motion to compel clerk assistance with service of process. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a summons for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia and the United States Attorney General and to mail those summonses to plaintiff so that plaintiff can effect service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/5/2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-17SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-06-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by no later than June 16, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) (If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court... must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant...). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 2, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-025AFFIDAVIT of mailing re 1 Complaint by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. (jf) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff To Show Cause due by 6/16/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-156RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Minute Order Filed On 06/02/2017, Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by no later than June 16, 2017 filed by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. (jf) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-277ERRATA 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Minute Order Filed On 06/02/2017, Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by no later than June 16, 2017 filed by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/22/2017 (jf) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-08-308AFFIDAVIT of mailing re 1 Complaint by ROBERT KOLBUSZ. (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-08-309MOTION for Default Judgment by ROBERT KOLBUSZ (jf) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff