Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWhitehead v. Caddo
DistrictWestern District of Louisiana
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2017cv00306
Date Filed2017-02-21
Date Closed2017-03-29
JudgeChief Judge Dee D Drell
Plaintiff**Sanctioned/Barred* David Louis Whitehead
Case DescriptionDavid Whitehead alleged that he was seriously injured when he ran into an over-hanging obstruction at the Shrevesport Public Library. He requested a copy of a video tape of the obstruction from the Public Library, which refused his request. Whitehead indicates in his complaint that he needs the tape to make his claim for injury, but this is not a FOIA claim, although he may have a cause of action under Louisiana's public records law.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantParish of Caddo
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-211COMPLAINT against Parish of Caddo filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet, # 2 Exhibits)(crt,Adams, K) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-212MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Louis Whitehead. (crt,Adams, K) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-213MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to Pay Filing Fees Should the Court Deny Waiver by David Louis Whitehead. (crt,Adams, K) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-21CASE Assigned to Chief Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-284PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Complaint, 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 3 Motion for Extension (Other) referred to Chief Judge Dee D Drell. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-295ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; denying 3 Motion for Extension.. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/29/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff