Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMontenegro v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
City
Case Number1:2017cv00212
Date Filed0000-00-00
Date ClosedOpen
Judge
PlaintiffTristan di Montenegro
Case DescriptionTristan di Montenegro submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI by certified mail. The Postal Service tracking system indicated the requests had been delivered. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Montenegro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-231COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Tristan di Montenegro. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dest, ) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-232MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tristan di Montenegro. (dest, ) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-243MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Tristan di Montenegro. (dest, ) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-014ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/1/2017. (dest, ) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-025ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/2/2017. (dest, ) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-136ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that this case (l:17-cv-212) is REASSIGNED to JudgeBrinkema. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/13/2017. (dest, ) (copy mailed as directed in the Order) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (dest, ) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-147Summons Issued to be served via USMS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dest, ) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-218SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tristan di Montenegro. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 3/20/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-309SUMMONS Returned Executed- United States Attorney General served on 3/3/2017 (dest, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1410SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tristan di Montenegro. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 4/7/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (acha, ) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff