Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMontenegro v. National Security Agency
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2017cv00216
Date Filed2017-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Leonie M. Brinkema
PlaintiffTristan di Montenegro
Case DescriptionTristan di Montenegro submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Agency by certified mail. The Postal Service tracking system indicated the request had been delivered. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Montenegro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Security Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-241COMPLAINT against National Security Agency, filed by Tristan di Montenegro. (Attachments: # 1 attachment 1, # 2 attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(klau, ) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-02-242MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tristan di Montenegro. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-02-243MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Tristan di Montenegro. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-034ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/3/17. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-095Sealed ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/9/17. (klau, ) Modified text on 3/10/2017 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-106Summons Issued and given to US Marshal for service as to National Security Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (klau, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-207ORDER that this case (1:17-cv-216) is REASSIGNED to Judge Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/20/17. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-218SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tristan di Montenegro. National Security Agency served on 3/20/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff