Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00365
Date Filed2017-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, representing claimants in a suit against the government concerning the aftermath of Hurricane Sandy, submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records concerning the cleanup after Hurricane Sandy. After the agency failed to respond, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-281COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4858310) filed by WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jan. 6, 2016, FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit Feb. 9, 2016, FOIA request, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Matteis, August) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (FOIA SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-012REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney filed by WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed summons to FEMA, # 2 Summons Proposed summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons Proposed summons to U.S. Attorney)(Krauss, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified mail delivery confirmation)(Krauss, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified mail delivery confirmation)(Krauss, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 3/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified mail delivery confirmation)(Krauss, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-04-037NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Katz on behalf of WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC (Katz, Joshua) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-058NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-059Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-0710GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 19, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 19, 2017, updating the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 4/19/2017, Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1911MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 19, 2017. It is further ORDERED that, upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 12, 2017, providing the Court with an update as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 19, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/19/2017, Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-06-1213NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin C. Davis on behalf of WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC (Davis, Kristin) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before August 12, 2017, providing the Court with an update as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 13, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-1915ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-08-1416Joint STATUS REPORT by WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC. (Davis, Kristin) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before October 2, 2017, providing the Court with an update as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 15, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2017 (hs) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-14Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-10-0217STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff by WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Kristin) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0218STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-2019ORDER: Defendant shall continue to process at least 1,000 pages per month related to the McKinsey communications request and shall continue to release records to Plaintiff on a monthly basis beginning with the next interim release on or before 11/15/2017. Joint status report due on or before 11/27/2017. Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/20/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2017; Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (tj) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff