Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCunningham v. Broadly et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv01701
Date Filed2017-03-07
Date Closed2017-07-28
JudgeJudge Colleen McMahon
PlaintiffBenjamin Cunningham
Case DescriptionBenjamin Cunningham submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning a 2008 crime victims decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cunningham filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantWilliam E. Broadly USMS Agency's FOIA Attorney
DefendantWilliam E. Broadly USMS Agency's FOIA Attorney
TERMINATED: 05/03/2017
DefendantDOJ Agency's Office of Information Policy (FOIA)
DefendantDOJ Agency's Office of Information Policy (FOIA)
TERMINATED: 06/29/2017
DefendantU.S. Government Office of Information Service
DefendantOffice of Information Policy(DOJ)
DefendantUnited States Marshals Service
DefendantU.S. D.O.J. Agency's Office of Inspector General, Investigation Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-071REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(rdz) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-072COMPLAINT against William E. Broadly, DOJ Agency's Office of Information Policy (FOIA). Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(rdz) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-07Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-203TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF MOTION DUE TO USMS AGENCY'S FOIA ATTORNEY REFUSED TO FILE FOIA RESPONSES AGAINST (PRO-SE)PLAINTIFF'S FOIA REQUEST DATED 7/13/16. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-294NOTICE OF MOTION SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BECAUSE FOIA DEFENDANTS REFUSED TO FILE RESPONSE AGAINST (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FOIA REQUEST 7/13/16 DOJ-AP-2017-002515. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(sc) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-125NOTICE OF MOTION SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BECAUSE THE OGIS AGENCY'S FOIA NONCOMPLIANCE & FOIA MEDIATION DECISION DATED APRIL 10, 2017 OGIS CASE #2017-02188. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(man) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-05-03Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 6 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rdz) Modified on 5/3/2017 (rdz). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03Mailed a copy of 6 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), with Amended Complaint Form attached, to Benjamin Cunningham 2429 Southern Blvd. #1 Bronx, NY 10458. (jgo) Modified on 5/3/2017 (rdz). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-036ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint to detail exhaustion of his administrative remedies under the FOIA. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 17-CV-1701 (CM). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court grants Plaintiffs request to proceed with this action. (ECF No. 2 at 9.) Plaintiffs motions for summary judgment (Docket Nos. 4, 5) are denied as moot. The Court dismisses Defendants William E. Broadly as an improper defendant under FOIA. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/3/2017) (rdz) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rdz) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-087RECONSIDERATION MOTION TO RESTORE USMS AGENCY'S FOIA ATTORNEY/OFFICER WILLIAM E. BORDLEY BACK INTO THE (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S VALID FOIA CIVIL RIGHTS CASE; re: 6 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(sc) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-178TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION ABOUT THE OVC AGENCY'S FOIA ATTORNEY/OFFICER DOROTHY A. LEE'S FOIA REPLY(FILE #13-00146) DATED 3/11/13 ALONG WITH 6/3/13 CLEARLY STATED USMS AGENCY'S OPR STAFF RECEIVED FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM REFERRAL DOCUMENTS. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-179TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION ABOUT THE USMS AGENCY'S FOIA ATTORNEY/OFFICER WILLIAM E. BORDLEY'S FOIA RESPONSE (FILE 2016-USMS-30651) DATED 5/11/17 IS WILLFULLY CONCEALING THE USMS AGENCY'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION (FILE #08-1519) DATED 12/23/08. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-2410TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION UNITED STATES DOJ AGENCY'S IG MICHAEL E. HOROWITZ HAS APPOINTED OVC AGENCY'S GC STAFF RAFAEL MADAN & USMS AGENCY'S OPR STAFF STANLEY E. GRISCAVAGE OPR STAFF DONALD O'HEARN TO CONDUCT AN INVESTIGATION INTO FOIA DISPUTE LINKED FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DISPUTE. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3011TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION OVC AGENCY'S GENERAL COUNSEL STAFF & USMS AGENCY'S OPR STAFF HAVE REFUSED TO ALLOW THE (PRO SE) PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR/TESTIFY/FILE EVIDENCE AT THEIR AGENCY PROCEEDINGS REGARDING THE FOIA CONFLICT. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sac) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0712TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION REGARDING(PRO-SE)PLAINTIFF (FAXED) THE DOJ INSPECTOR GENERAL OFFICE'S INVESTIGATION LETTER DATED 5/23/17, OVER TO OGIS AGENCY'S DIRECTOR & DOJ AGENCY'S ASSIGNED FOIA APPEAL STAFF MEMBERS Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-1213(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF FILED HIS OVC AGENCY'S NEW FOIA REQUEST (#17-00243) DATED 6/8/17 DUE TO FOIA CONFLICT/DISPUTE WITH USMS AGENCY'S FOIA REPLY (2016-USMS-30651) DATED 5/11/17. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-1914(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE THE (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL FOIA CIVIL CASE FILED INSIDE WASHINGTON, DC FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET #13-CIV-0188(RMC) AGAINST (4) FEDERAL AGENCIES CONCERNS (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2015(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE FBI AGENCY FOIA OFFICER DAVID M. HARDY'S DECLARATION DOCUMENT DATED 6/10/13 INSIDE DOCKET #13-CIV- 0188 (RMC) STATED "NO RECORD EXISTS" DUE TO FBI SPECIAL AGENT'S PERSONAL NOTES STATUS LINKED TO (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-2016(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE (SDNY) USAO AGENCY FOIA OFFICER MICHELLE SMITH'S FOIA DECLARATION DOCUMENT DATED 5/22/13 INSIDE DOCKET #13-CIV-0188 (RMC) STATED "NO RECORDS EXISTS" LINKED TO (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-2017(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE EOUSA AGENCY FOIA OFFICER DAVID LUCZYNSKI'S FOIA DECLARATION DOCUMENT DATED 5/31/13 INSIDE DOCKET #13-CIV-0188 (RMC) STATED "NO RECORDS EXISTS" LINKED TO (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-2118(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE USMS AGENCY FOIA OFFICER WILLIAM E. BORDLEY REFUSED TO FILE FOIA RESPONSES & FOIA DECLARATION DOCUMENTS DOCKET #13-CIV-0188 (RMC) LINKED TO (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM DECISION. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2119(Notice) TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OJP/OVC AGENCY FOIA OFFICER DOROTHY A. LEE'S FOIA DECLARATION DOCUMENT DATED 6/7/13 INSIDE DOCKET #13-CIV-0188 (RMC) STATED (PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM MATERIAL DOCUMENTS WERE SENT TO USMS AGENCY'S OPR STAFF. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2620NOTICE OF MOTION SEEKS TO RESTORE FOIA DEFENDANT WILLIAM E. BORDLEY ESQ. BACK INTO (PRO SE) PLAINTIFF'S FOIA CIVIL RIGHTS CASE DUE TO HIS FOIA RESPONSE DATED 5/11/17 HAS WILLFULLY CONCEALED HIS PRIOR FOIA RESPONSE DATED 1/15/13. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2921AMENDED COMPLAINT against Office of Information Policy(DOJ), U.S. D.O.J. Agency's Office of Inspector General-Investigation Division, U.S. Government Office of Information Service, United States Marshals Service, re: amending 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(sc) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-0622TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION REGARDING THE USMS AGENCY'S FOIA RESPONSE DECISION (#2016-USMS-31886) DATED 6/23/17 HAS OFFICIALLY PRODUCED USMS AGENCY'S (EDNY) EMPLOYEE MISCONDUCT INVESTIGATION DECISION (FILE #16-0386) DATED 3/17/16. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-0623TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE MOTION REGARDING THE USMS AGENCY'S FOIA RESPONSE DECISION (#1016-USMS-31886) DATED 6/23/17 HAS OFFICIALLY PRODUCED THE FBI AGENCY'S MEMORANDUM LETTER DATED 2/1/16. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1424NOTICE OF MOTION SEEKING PERMISSION TO FILE AN ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCY APPEAL AGAINST (EDNY) USMS AGENCY'S INVESTIGATION DECISION (FILE #16-0386) DATED 3/17/16. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(sc) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-2625NOTICE OF MOTION SEEKING TO REOPEN CHIEF JUDGE MCMAHON'S DECISION/ORDER DATED 7/18/17 WHICH CLAIM(PRO-SE) PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSIONS ARE DIFFICULT FOR THE COURT TO UNDERSTAND.. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham.(sc) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2626NOTICE OF MOTION TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE USMS AGENCY'S FOIA RESPONSE DECISION (2016 USMS 31886), DATED 6/23/17 IS PENDING FOIA APPEAL(DOJ-AP-2017-005284) DATED 7/14/17. Document filed by Benjamin Cunningham. (sc) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2827ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiffs amended complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed under 5 U.S.C. § 552(a (6)(A) as prematurely filed. Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 7) is denied because individuals may not be sued in FOIA actions. See 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(B). Plaintiffs motion requesting leave to file an administrative appeal (ECF No. 24) is denied as frivolous. Plaintiffs motion seeking to reopen the Court's decision in Cunningham, No. 17-CV-5104 (ECF No. 25) is dismissed as frivolous. Plaintiff remains barred from from filing any new action without first obtaining leave to file from the Court. See Cunningham v. United States Marshals Serv., No. 05-CV-10169 (DAB)(KNF) (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 2, 2016). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/28/2017) (rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-2828CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the amended complaint is dismissed under 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(6)(A) as prematurely filed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/28/2017) (rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 28 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), 27 Order of Dismissal, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28Mailed a copy of 28 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), with Notice of Right to Appeal Form attached, 27 Order of Dismissal, to Benjamin Cunningham 2429 Southern Blvd. #1 Bronx, NY 10458. (jgo) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff