Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-03-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19503128 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Attorney Jonathan R Hickman added to party Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.(pty:pla))(Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2017) |
2017-03-13 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2017) |
2017-03-13 | 3 | NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C., identifying United Aeronautical Corporation. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2017) |
2017-03-13 | 4 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2017) |
2017-03-13 | 5 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2017) |
2017-03-14 | 6 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) (Entered: 03/14/2017) |
2017-03-14 | 7 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant National Guard Bureau. (car) Modified on 3/14/2017 (car). (Entered: 03/14/2017) |
2017-03-14 | 8 | NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error docket entry Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 7 has been modified. **Summons docket item 7 is issued as to Defendant National Guard Bureau** (car) (Entered: 03/14/2017) |
2017-03-14 | 9 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Air National Guard. (car) (Entered: 03/14/2017) |
2017-03-15 | 10 | ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 03/15/2017) |
2017-03-31 | 11 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C., upon Defendant National Guard Bureau served on 3/18/2017, answer due 5/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FDR - Mailroom. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Erly Sase - Agent. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to agent. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. FRCP 4(i) via certified mail, delivery confirmations attached (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3)(Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-03-31 | 12 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C., upon Defendant Air National Guard served on 3/18/2017, answer due 5/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FDR - Mailroom. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Erly Sase - Agent. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to agent. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. FRCP 4(i) via certified mail, delivery confirmations attached (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3)(Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-03-31 | 13 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FDR - Mailroom. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Erly Sase - Agent. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to agent. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. FRCP 4(i) via certified mail, delivery confirmations attached (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3)(Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-05-17 | 14 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/31/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Air National Guard(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party National Guard Bureau(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 05/17/2017) |
2017-05-22 | 15 | ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendants, National Guard Bureau and Air National Guard, shall have to and including May 31, 2017, to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (iv) (Entered: 05/23/2017) |
2017-06-02 | 16 | (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than June 9, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv) (Entered: 06/02/2017) |
2017-06-06 | 17 | ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 06/06/2017) |
2017-06-19 | 18 | (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has reviewed and considered the parties response to the Order to Show Cause 17 . Good cause appearing, the OSC is hereby DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/19/2017) |
2017-06-19 | 19 | SCHEDULING NOTICE RE: DUE DATE OF EARLY MEETING REPORT/JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by Judge Manuel L. Real. An Answer has been filed in this matter. Pursuant to this Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel, a Joint Rule 26(f) Report/ Early Meeting Report is due on or before July 21, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/19/2017) |
2017-07-21 | 20 | JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Report of Early Meeting ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C... (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/21/2017) |
2017-09-29 | 21 | ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on FEBRUARY 26, 2018 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before FEBRUARY 5, 2018, which date will also serve as the discovery cut- off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before FEBRUARY 19, 2018. COURT TRIAL DATE is set as MARCH 27, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch) (Entered: 09/29/2017) |
2018-01-31 | 22 | Joint STIPULATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE from 02/26/18 AND 03/27/18 to 05/28/18 AND 06/26/18 filed by Defendants Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 01/31/2018) |
2018-02-05 | 23 | ORDER CONTINUING THE PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 22 by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pretrial and trial dates are continued as follows: Discovery Cut-Off Date - February 12, 2018; Pretrial Documents - February 12, 2018; Pretrial Conference Order - February 26, 2018; Final Pretrial Conference - March 5, 2018 at 11:00 AM; Court Trial - April 3, 2018 at 9:00 AM. (lom) (Entered: 02/05/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 24 | Witness List filed by Defendant Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau.. (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 25 | MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau. (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 26 | MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 27 | Witness List filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C... (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 28 | JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C... (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-13 | 29 | ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2018) |
2018-02-21 | 30 | Joint STIPULATION to Continue THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE from 03/05/2018 to 03/12/2018 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 23 filed by Defendant Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 02/21/2018) |
2018-02-22 | 31 | ORDER CONTINUING THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Stipulation 30 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 3/12/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk) (Entered: 02/23/2018) |
2018-02-26 | 32 | NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Esquire Corporate Services, L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Hickman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2018) |
2018-03-07 | 33 | STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Air National Guard, National Guard Bureau.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/07/2018) |
Hide Docket Events |