Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00485
Date Filed2017-03-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffTRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Trustees of Princeton University filed a reverse-FOIA suit against the Department of Education to block disclosure of records concerning an investigation of Princeton by the Office of Civil Rights to Students for Fair Admissions. The Education Department told Princeton that it would redact personally-identifying information under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Students for Fair Admissions has filed suit against the Department of Education to force disclosure. Princeton filed suit primarily arguing that some of the information is protected by Exemption 4 (confidential business information).
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS
STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
2200 Wilson Blvd
Suite 102-13
Arlington, VA 22201
DefendantSTUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
2200 Wilson Blvd
Suite 102-13
Arlington, VA 22201
DefendantSTUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4879326) filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-172NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-2154. (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-173SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-304Consent MOTION to Intervene and Consolidate by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, John). Added MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 4/7/2017 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-305Corporate Disclosure Statement by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Connolly, John) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-046NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-05-09ORDER granting 4 Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene as a Defendant in this action and granting 4 the Consent Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is hereby ORDERED that cases No. 17-cv-0485-TSC and No. 16-cv-2154-TSC are CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/9/2017. (lctsc2) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-09Case consolidated with Member Case no. 16-cv-2154 TSC. NO FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE MEMBER CASE NO.. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD NO. 17-CV-485 TSC ONLY. (td) Modified on 5/10/2017 (ztd). (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 3/23/2017 (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2017. (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-179RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS served on 3/24/2017 (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/24/2017. (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-1711Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Connolly, John) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Answer is due by 5/26/2017. Defendant shall certify and transmit the administrative record and file a certified list of the contents of the record by 6/16/2017. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by 7/17/2017. Amicus briefs in support of Plaintiff's motion are due by 7/24/2017. Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenor's Combined Oppositions and Cross-Motions are due by 9/1/2017. Amicus briefs in support of Cross-Motions are due by 9/8/2017. Plaintiff's Combined Reply and Opposition is due by 9/22/2017. Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenor's Replies are due by 10/20/2017. Copy of the administrative record cited by parties is due to the court by 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/2017. (lctsc2) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 6/16/2017. Answer due by 5/26/2017. Summary Judgment motion due by 7/17/2017. Response/Cross Motion due by 9/1/2017. Response/Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/22/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/20/2017. Copy of administrative record cited by parties is due to the court by 11/3/2017. (tb) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-2612ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-1613ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Certified Index) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-2614MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, John) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-05MINUTE ORDER: To the extent the Trustees of Princeton University or the Defendants object to the Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record 14 filed by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC., they shall file a response by 7/10/17 of no more than ten pages. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/5/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-0715Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants and Plaintiff shall file their response (not to exceed 10 pages) to Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record 14 by July 17, 2017. Once the court rules on the pending motion the parties may submit a proposed briefing schedule for summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/7/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/17/2017. (tb) Modified on 7/10/2017 (tb). (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1716Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1717NOTICE of Proposed Order by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY re 16 Memorandum in Opposition (Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1718NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Daniel Schaefer Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00485-TSC, 1:16-cv-02154-TSC(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1719RESPONSE re 14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1720Unopposed MOTION to Remand and Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff