Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00510
Date Filed2017-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Native American Disability Law Center submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records about the Havasupai Reservation Elementary School. The agency asked the Center for clarification of its request. The Center clarified its request. After 15 months, the agency provided some records. The Center then filed a complaint with the Office of Government Information Services. The Center also filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-211COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4883620) filed by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-213SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-214STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/21/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-04-055ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER re 1 Complaint, . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service United Status Bureau of Indian Affairs, # 2 Certificate of Service Bureau of Indian Education, # 3 Certificate of Service Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Certificate of Service U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice)(DeSanctis, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2017 (jf). (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-06NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct docket event (SERVICE OF PROCESS). (jf) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2017. (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/23/17. (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION served on 3/27/2017 (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/27/2017 (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-1110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 3/27/2017 (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-2411NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2612ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on May 2, 2017, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/26/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-27Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/2/2017, at 3:15 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-2813Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 13 , the status conference currently scheduled for May 2, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for June 20, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before June 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The Status Conference set for 5/2/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 6/20/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Parties are to file a further Joint Status Report on or before 6/14/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-06-1414MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bradley S. Phillips; Bryan H. Heckenlively; Seth Fortin, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 350 South Grand Avenue, 50th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-683-9100. Fax No. - 213-687-3702 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4991143. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration Phillips, # 2 Declaration Declaration Heckenlively, # 3 Declaration Declaration Fortin, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Admission of Attorneys Pro Hac Vice 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Bradley S. Phillips, Bryan H. Heckenlively, and Seth J. Fortin are hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-1616NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Golder on behalf of NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER (Golder, Chad) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-20ENTERED IN ERROR..... Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/20/2017. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) Modified on 6/20/2017, entered in wrong case (kt). (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at the status conference held on June 20, 2017, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before July 20, 2017. The parties are further ORDERED to appear for a status conference on July 26, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 6/20/2017. Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2017. A further Status Conference is set for 7/26/2017, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-2017Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. (DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 17 , the status conference currently scheduled for July 26, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for August 30, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on August 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/20/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2017. The Status Conference set for 7/26/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 8/30/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-2318Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 18 , the status conference currently scheduled for August 30, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for September 25, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on September 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/24/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2017. The Status Conference set for 8/30/2017, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 9/25/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-1819Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 19 , the status conference currently scheduled for September 25, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for October 30, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before October 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/19/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2017. The Status Conference set for 9/25/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10/30/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-10-1820Joint STATUS REPORT re progress of FOIA releases by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. (Fortin, Seth) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 20 , the status conference currently scheduled for October, 30, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for November 27, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before November 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2017. The Status Conference set for 10/30/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 11/27/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zkt) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-3121NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER. Attorney Seth J. Fortin terminated. (Fortin, Seth) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-1522MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily C. Curran-Huberty, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 560 Mission Street, 27th Fl., San Francisco, CA. Phone No. - 415-512-4000. Fax No. - 415-512-4077 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5206849. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIVE AMERICAN DISABILITY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily C. Curran-Huberty ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeSanctis, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Emily C. Curran-Huberty is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/16/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-2023Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 20, 2017. The joint status report should address a proposed briefing schedule, should one be necessary at that time. It is further ORDERED that the status conference previously set for November 27, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for December 21, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/21/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2017. The Status Conference set for 11/27/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 12/21/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-2024Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 24 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 17, 2018. The joint status report should address a proposed briefing schedule, should one be necessary at that time. It is further ORDERED that the status conference previously set for December 21, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for January 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2018. The Status Conference set for 12/21/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 1/18/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-1725Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 16, 2018. The joint status report should address a proposed briefing schedule, should one be necessary at that time. It is further ORDERED that the status conference previously set for January 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for February 20, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/17/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2018. The Status Conference set for 1/18/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 2/20/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff