Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePETROFF v. RACHELS et al
DistrictMiddle District of Georgia
CityAlbany
Case Number1:2017cv00066
Date Filed2017-03-27
Date Closed2017-04-17
JudgeUS DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS
PlaintiffSEAN PETROFF
Case DescriptionSean Petroff, a federal prisoner, requested information from Reggie Rachals, Sheriff of Lee County, Georgia. Rachals did not respond and Petroff filed suit. He may have a claim under Georgia's access law, but this is not a federal FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantSHERIFF REGGIE RACHELS Lee County Sheriff
DefendantJOHN DOE Lee County Prosecutor Office
DefendantJOHN DOE Lee County Sheriff Office
DefendantJOHN DOE Lee County Prosecutor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope)(bcl) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(bcl) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-273Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SEAN PETROFF (bcl) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-174ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 4/17/2017. (bcl) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-175JUDGMENT of dismissal. (bcl) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff