Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePETROFF v. SESSIONS et al
DistrictMiddle District of Georgia
CityAlbany
Case Number1:2017cv00067
Date Filed2017-03-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUS DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS
PlaintiffSEAN PETROFF
Case DescriptionSean Petroff, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Petroff filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Attorney General JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
DefendantJOHN DOE Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia
DefendantJOHN DOE U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia
DefendantJOHN DOE Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-271COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III filed by SEAN PETROFF (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-273Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SEAN PETROFF. (mdm) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-254ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to resubmit the exhibits docketed in 1:11-cr-00011-WLS-TQL-1 as exhibits in this case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 04/25/2017. (mdm) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-085NOTICE of Filing of Correspondence from US Department of Justice to Petroff regarding incorrect service. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-116MOTION for Leave to Submit Exhibits as Directed by the Court Filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - H - Exhibits docketed in case number 1:11-cr-11)(bcl) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-157This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to File Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 5/15/17 (rlw2) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-198Letter from Sean Petroff regarding service. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from USDOJ, # 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Session, # 3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - US Attorney, # 4 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - GAMD US Attorney, # 5 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-249ORDER FOR SERVICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 05/24/2017. (mdm) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2410USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III (Attachments: # 1 USM 285, # 2 USM 285, # 3 USM 285)(mdm) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/24/2017) (mdm). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2411Summons Issued as to JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(mdm) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2612USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III (mdm) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-07-11Filing fee Paid: Initial Partial Filing Fee $20.15 (bcl) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-3113MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re 1 Complaint, : by JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III filed by STEWART R BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(BROWN, STEWART) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-1814MOTION for Leave to Amend for Purpose of Enjoining Parties filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-1815RESPONSE filed by SEAN PETROFF re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-0116REPLY to Response filed by JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re 1 Complaint, : (BROWN, STEWART) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-0117RESPONSE filed by JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amend for Purpose of Enjoining Parties (BROWN, STEWART) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-1518SURREPLY FILED WITHOUT PERMISSION by SEAN PETROFF re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-15Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): 18 SURREPLY FILED WITHOUT PERMISSION by SEAN PETROFF ); Document requires leave of court before filing. (mdm) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2219MOTION for Leave to Submit, Pursuant to FRE 201, Motion for Order; MOTION for Relief filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Various Case Related Documents, # 2 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2520RESPONSE filed by JOHN DOE(U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Office of U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JOHN DOE(Assistant U.S. Attorney - Middle District of Georgia), JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Submit, Pursuant to FRE 201, Motion for OrderMOTION for Relief (BROWN, STEWART) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2821MOTION for Leave to Submit Traverse Motion filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Deficiency, # 2 Proposed Traverse Response, # 3 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-2322MOTION for Leave to Submit Reply to 20 Response filed by SEAN PETROFF. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-2323REPLY to Response filed by SEAN PETROFF re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Submit, Pursuant to FRE 201, Motion for Order MOTION for Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff