Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStevens v. United States Department of State
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2017cv02494
Date Filed2017-03-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable John Z. Lee
PlaintiffJacqueline Stevens
Case DescriptionJacqueline Stevens, a political science professor at Northwestern University, submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State concerning the agency's help in setting up a Northwestern campus in Qatar as well as other U.S.-affiliated universities. She also requested records concerning USAID aid to the Center for Independent Journalists. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Stevens filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-311COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Stevens. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-312CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-313PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jacqueline Stevens. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-315SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United States Department of State; U.S. Attorney General; U.S. Attorney. (ph, ) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-13ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of State. (ags, ) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-136DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Department of State (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-19ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jn, ) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-257MOTION by Defendant United States Department of State for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-258NOTICE of Motion by Alex Harms Hartzler for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 7 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/2/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-269MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint until 5/10/17 7 is granted. Initial status hearing set for 5/24/17 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-05-0410RETURN of Service of summons returned executed on 4/24/2017 as to U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Attorney) (kp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0411SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Stevens as to United States Department of State served on 4/25/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (kp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1012ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of State(Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1813STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by United States Department of State (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-2414MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 5/24/17. Plaintiff reports that the responses to the FOIA request are ongoing. Defense counsel reports that the documents will be produced on a rolling basis. All further deadlines in this case are stayed until 7/26/17. Status hearing set for 7/26/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-07-2615MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 7/26/17. The defendant is continuing to provide documents to Plaintiff in response to her FOIA request. At the next status the government should report the timeframe for the production of the remaining documents. Status hearing set for 9/14/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-2216MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 9/14/17 is reset to 9/20/17 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-09-0817MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 9/20/17 is reset to 10/3/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-2918STATUS Report by United States Department of State (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0319MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 10/3/17. For the reasons stated, the Court exercises its discretion and sets a schedule for this case to proceed. Both parties state that no discovery is necessary for this case. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be due by 1/12/18. A status hearing is set for 1/24/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0320STATUS Report by Jacqueline Stevens. (pk, ) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-0521MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 1/24/18 is reset to 1/30/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-12-1222MOTION by Defendant United States Department of State to Amend Case Schedule (Unopposed) (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1223NOTICE of Motion by Alex Harms Hartzler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 22 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/19/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1824MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Unopposed motion to amend the case schedule 22 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment deadline is stricken. The status hearing set for 1/30/18 is reset to 2/27/18 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff