Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBURWELL v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00562
Date Filed2017-03-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffGREGORY WAYNE BURWELL
Case DescriptionGregory Burwell, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged the request and told Burwell that his request was considered complex and would take some time to process. Burwell then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-291COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by GREGORY WAYNE BURWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-29SUMMONS Not Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (jf) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY WAYNE BURWELL (jf) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-293PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by GREGORY WAYNE BURWELL (jf) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-294ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0.00 from Prison Account of Gregory Wayne Burwell and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/28/2017. (jf) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-135SUMMONS (3) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-196NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/14/2017. (jf) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/27/2017. (jf) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-109First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 9 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and the BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES shall file its Answer or other response to the Complaint by 8/14/2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/15/17. (ms) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/14/2017, (mac) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-1210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES served on 6/7/2017 (jf) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-08-1111Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-14MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting 11 defendant's second motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The defendant shall file its answer or other response to the complaint by no later than October 13, 2017. Government counsel is admonished to seek extensions of time no less than three business days before a filing is due. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/14/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 10/13/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-10-0512Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting 12 defendant's third motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Court finds there is good cause to issue this extension. It is therefore ordered that the defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/6/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or other response to complaint due by 11/3/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/07/2017)
2017-11-0213MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-03MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting 13 defendant's fourth motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Court finds there is good cause to issue this extension. It is therefore ordered that the defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 30, 2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 11/30/2017, (mac) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-3014MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Chisholm, # 2 Chisholm Decl. Exhibits A through G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-0415Order advising plaintiff to respond by 1/12/2018 to the 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/4/17. (ms) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-2616MOTION for Extension of Time to, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GREGORY WAYNE BURWELL (jf) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 16 16 is hereby granted, and he shall file his opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and cross-motion by February 12, 2018. If the plaintiff does not respond by that date, the Court may treat the motion as conceded and, if warranted, may enter judgment for the defendant. The defendant shall file its reply and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion by March 12, 2018. The plaintiff shall file his reply by April 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/2/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment And Cross Motion Due by 2/12/2018. Defendant Reply And Opposition To The Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 3/12/2018. Plaintiff Reply due by 4/12/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff