Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWheeler v. Mahar et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv01256
Date Filed2017-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William S. Duffey, Jr
PlaintiffEdd D. Wheeler
Case DescriptionBrad Wheeler submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Barack Obama's passport. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wheeler filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantHarry Mahar Assistant U.S. Secretary of State for Administration
DefendantDavid T. Donahue Assistant U.S. Secretary of State for Consular Affairs
DefendantJonathan Rolbin Director, Office of Passport Legal Affairs and Law Enforcement Liaison, Department of U.S. Secretary of State
DefendantChief of Freedom of Information Act Requests Bureau of Consular Affairs, Office of Passport Services, Law Enforcement Liaison Division, Department of U.S. Secretary of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-071COMPLAINT filed by Edd D. Wheeler. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GAN100091780) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-262Letter, dated April 24, 2017, from Plaintiff regarding service of Defendants. (ddm) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-093Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ddm) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-124NOTICE Of Filing Certified Mail Receipts regarding service upon Defendants filed by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-225NOTICE Of Filing Answer to Summons In A Civil Action filed by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-306MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Chief of Freedom of Information Act Requests, David T. Donahue, Harry Mahar, Jonathan Rolbin. (Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-077RESPONSE in Opposition to 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-088REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chief of Freedom of Information Act Requests, David T. Donahue, Harry Mahar, Jonathan Rolbin. (Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-12Submission of 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-149MOTION to Amend Designation of the Defendants by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-1410CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE to various parties filed by Edd D. Wheeler.(ddm) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-1511RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Amend Designation of the Defendants filed by Chief of Freedom of Information Act Requests, David T. Donahue, Harry Mahar, Jonathan Rolbin. (Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-1612Final Answer to 8 Defendants' Reply for Dismissal filed by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-1913MOTION to Strike 12 Response (Non-Motion) with Brief In Support by Chief of Freedom of Information Act Requests, David T. Donahue, Harry Mahar, Jonathan Rolbin. (Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-03Submission of 9 MOTION to Amend Designation of the Defendants, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-11Submission of 13 MOTION to Strike 12 Response, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1714NOTICE of Brief Unavailability for the week of July 15, 2017 filed by Edd D. Wheeler. (ddm) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff