Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHENLEY v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictSouthern District of Indiana
CityIndianapolis
Case Number1:2017cv01034
Date Filed2017-04-03
Date Closed2017-05-22
JudgeJudge Tanya Walton Pratt
PlaintiffJAMES HENLEY
Case DescriptionJames Henley submitted a FOIA request to the FBI. After hearing nothing further, Henley filed
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-031COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, filed by JAMES HENLEY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-042MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-103ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through May 3, 2017, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/10/2017.(JLS) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-184MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena Under rule 45, filed by Plaintiff JAMES HENLEY, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(JLS) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-05-055Entry on In Forma Pauperis Status - On April 10, 2017, the Court ordered the plaintiff to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action. The plaintiff has failed to do so or otherwise respond by the deadline. The plaintiff shall have through May 19, 2017, to comply with the Court's previous order. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Because the filing fee is not yet resolved, the plaintiff's motion to issue a subpoena, dkt. 4 , is denied without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/5/2017. (JLS) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-176MOTION for Discovery, filed by Plaintiff JAMES HENLEY, no c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(JLS) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-177NOTICE of Change of Address for JAMES HENLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (JLS) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-228Entry Dismissing Case and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - The plaintiff was informed in No 1:15-cv-00845-TWP-DKL, he was three strikes and is thus ineligible to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Instead of addressing this issue or paying the filing fee, despite two warnings to do so, the plaintiff simply ignored the Court's filing fee orders. Because of this, this action is dismissed for failure to prosecute and for failure to pay the filing fee.The plaintiff's motion for discovery, dkt. 6 , is denied as moot. Final judgment in accordance with this Entry shall now issue. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/22/2017. (JLS) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-229CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58. The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/22/2017. (JLS) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff