Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWu v. National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2014cv01603
Date Filed2014-10-29
Date Closed2017-03-08
JudgeJudge Dominic J. Squatrito
PlaintiffChristine M. Wu
Case DescriptionChristine Wu submitted a FOIA request to the National Geospatial Intelligence Agency for records concerning satellite images of her property. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wu filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Geospatial-Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-10-291COMPLAINT against National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, filed by Christine M. Wu.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
2014-10-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christine M. Wu. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
2014-10-293Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/29/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2014 Discovery due by 4/30/2015 Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2015 Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2014.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
2014-10-294STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/2014.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
2014-10-305ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/30/2014.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
2015-01-136ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 1/13/2015. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-157NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF: Plaintiff initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Standing Protective Order, 1 Complaint filed by Christine M. Wu, 5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christine M. Wu Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2015.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-158USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, OPTD, Standing Protective Order, Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff, Order granting IFP,Guide to Pro Se Litigants, etc. and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-269ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2015. (Walker, A) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-03-18USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service, Complaint, OPTD, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant. (Walker, A) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
2015-04-0110MOTION to Amend/Correct by Christine M. Wu. Responses due by 4/22/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
2015-04-1611AFFIDAVIT of Service for Waiver of Summons served on National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency on 4/8/2015, filed by Christine M. Wu. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
2015-05-1112ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 5/11/2015.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2015-05-1213ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend the Complaint 1 . The clerk shall docket the amended complaint attached to document 10 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/12/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
2015-05-1314AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, filed by Christine M. Wu.(Glynn, T.) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
2015-07-0616NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Nelson on behalf of National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency (O'Connor, T) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-0617MOTION to Dismiss by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency.Responses due by 7/27/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(O'Connor, T) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-0715ORDER. In reviewing this case, the Court noted that the defendant is a government agency and was not properly served. The Clerk's Office shall send the proper paperwork to the plaintiff with instructions as to how service should be made on a government agency. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 7/7/15.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-0718ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss. See Court's Order 15 . Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 7/7/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-0819ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Christine M. Wu* *3625 Rialto Heights, #343* *Colorado Springs, CO 80907*. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-0820USM 285 forms together with 15 Order, Summons, 3 OPTD, 4 SPO, 6 Order Granting IFP, 7 Service Packet, Guide to Pro Se Litigants, and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-0921MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency by Christine M. Wu. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1322ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Since the defendant was not properly served, the defendant could not appear or answer. See Court's Order 15 . If after service has been properly made and the defendant still does not answer, the plaintiff can refile her Motion for Default. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 7/13/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-08-0723USM 285 forms together with Summons, Order, OPTD, Standing Protective Order, Order Granting IFP, reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s). (Payton, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-09-1424ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-2525NOTICE TO COUNSEL. The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days, after the conference, the participants must jointly complete and file a report of the conference using Form 26(f) Report. It appears that more than 40 days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, that the parties must file a Form 26(f) Report within 10 days of the date of this Order, October 5, 2015, along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of the complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/25/15.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-09-25Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2015 (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-09-2826ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Order requesting the parties to file a 26(f) Report, see 25 Order dated September 25, 2015, is hereby VACATED. The parties shall file a joint report by December 18, 2015 as to the status of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/28/15.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-09-28Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/18/2015 (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-09-2827SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine M. Wu. National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency served on 9/2/2015, answer due 9/23/2015. (Anastasio, F.) Modified to edit date filed on 9/29/2015 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-10-2228MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to National Geospatial Intelligence Agency by Christine M. Wu. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-2229NOTICE on Conference Report by Christine M. Wu. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-2930OBJECTION and Response to Plaintiff's 29 Notice on Conference Report, 28 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to National Geospatial Intelligence Agency filed by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
2015-12-0831ORDER denying 28 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). This Court realizes that although the case was not properly served, it was not the fault of the defendant, but that of the court in not sending the proper paperwork for service. Therefore, the defendant should not be penalized for an action that was beyond his control. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 12/8/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0832Joint STATUS REPORT by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-01-0733ORDER. After a review of the parties 32 Joint Status Report filed December 8,2015, the Court approves the date by which a dispositive motion shall be filed. Dispositive motions shall be filed by May 31, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 1/7/16.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-07Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2016 (Pike, C.) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-05-1134MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2016 for the dispositive motion deadline by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-1235MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/31/2016 to File a Dispositive Motion by Christine M. Wu. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-1336ORDER granting 34 and 35 Motions for Extension of Time until August 31, 2016 to file a dispositive motion, IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/13/16. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-13Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2016 (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-07-1437MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christine M. Wu. Responses due by 8/4/2016. (Sundie, T) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-2638MOTION for Summary Judgment by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency.Responses due by 8/16/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support and in Opposition to Plaintiff's 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, # 2 Local Rule 56(a)1 Statement, # 3 Notice, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3)(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-1739RESPONSE re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine M. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6) (Sundie, T) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-1940REPLY to Response to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-09-1941RESPONSE re 40 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Christine M. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Sundie, T) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2017-03-0842MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/8/17. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0843JUDGMENT entered in favor of National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency against Christine M. Wu. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/8/17.(Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-08JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff