Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFLORY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00661
Date Filed2017-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffGRAYSON FLORY
Case DescriptionGrayson Flory, who publishes the Earth First Journal, submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records about his publication, himself and his two co-owners. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency indicated that it could find no records for one request, but found more than 1400 pages pertaining to another co-owner. After Flory was dissatisfied with the agency's failure to resolve the remaining requests, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by GRAYSON FLORY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-17SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-172MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GRAYSON FLORY (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-17FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED" Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/07/2017. (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-183GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/18/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-184REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GRAYSON FLORY.(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-05-045REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General filed by GRAYSON FLORY.(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-056SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-057REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia filed by GRAYSON FLORY.(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-088SUMMONS(1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (td) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-089SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-3110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2017. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-3111ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the U.S. Department of Justice by GRAYSON FLORY (Strugar, Matthew) Modified on 6/1/2017 (ztd). (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-3112RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/15/2017 (td) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 11 Notice (Other) was entered in error and said pleading has been refiled, using the correct event, as docket entry no. 12 .) (td) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/15/2017. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-1414ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 6/29/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/15/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-2815Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-29MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 9/12/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/29/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-09-1216Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 11/21/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/12/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-15Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff