Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMontes Bojorquez v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv00780
Date Filed2017-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gonzalo P. Curiel
PlaintiffJuan Manuel Montes Bojorquez
Case DescriptionJuan Manuel Montes Bojorquez submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning his removal from the United States to Mexico after believing he was eligible to stay in the United States because of the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrival program instituted during the Obama administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency. Montes Bojorquez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
TERMINATED: 05/22/2017
DefendantJohn Kelly Secretary, Department of Homeland
DefendantJohn Kelly Secretary, Department of Homeland
TERMINATED: 09/11/2017
DefendantKevin K. McAleenan Acting Commissioner, United States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantPatricia McGurk Patrol Agent-in-Charge, Calexico Border Patrol Station
DefendantElaine Duke Secretary, Department of Homeland
DefendantUnited We Dream
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-181COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10001993.), filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-780-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Almadani, Monica)(dsn) (jao). (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-182Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) (jao). (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-283NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy E. Tolchin on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Tolchin, Stacy)Attorney Stacy E. Tolchin added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-284NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C. Tumlin on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Tumlin, Karen)Attorney Karen C. Tumlin added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-285NOTICE of Appearance by Nora A. Preciado on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Preciado, Nora)Attorney Nora A. Preciado added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-026NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Escobosa Helzer on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Helzer, Belinda)Attorney Belinda Escobosa Helzer added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-087SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. All Defendants served. (Mobley-Ritter, Devon) (jpp). (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-088NOTICE of Appearance by Devon Mobley-Ritter on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Mobley-Ritter, Devon)Attorney Devon Mobley-Ritter added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-119Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint, and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1210ORDER Granting Joint 9 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a first amended complaint is extended from May 12, 2017 to May 22, 2017. In the event that a FAC is not filed, the deadline for Defendants to file a response to the currently operative complaint which was filed on April 18, 2017 is extended from May 22, 2017 to June 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/17. (dlg) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-2211FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez.New Summons Requested. (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-2312Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-2413Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint by United States Customs and Border Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (dlg). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2414RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Chen, Mark) (dlg). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2515RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3016NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Chen on behalf of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Chen, Mark)Attorney Mark Chen added to party Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez(pty:pla) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-3117ORDER granting 13 Ex Parte Application for an Order Establishing Time for Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/31/2017. (fth) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0618SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. All Defendants served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Chen, Mark) (fth). (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-07-0619NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron S. Goldsmith on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection (Goldsmith, Aaron)Attorney Aaron S. Goldsmith added to party John Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron S. Goldsmith added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron S. Goldsmith added to party Patricia McGurk(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron S. Goldsmith added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron S. Goldsmith added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-0720NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Patrice Grant on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection (Grant, Nicole)Attorney Nicole Patrice Grant added to party John Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Patrice Grant added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Patrice Grant added to party Patricia McGurk(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Patrice Grant added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Patrice Grant added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1221NOTICE of Change of Address by Monica Ramirez Almadani (Almadani, Monica) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1322CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez re 21 Notice of Change of Address (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1323NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Chen (Chen, Mark) (dlg). (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1424*** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 28 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez, # 3 Exhibit 2-4, # 4 Declaration of Jane Doe [Redacted], # 5 Declaration of Leslie Itzel Ramirez Vega, # 6 Declaration of Jose Manuel Zarate, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Declaration of Kamylee G. Zarate, # 9 Declaration of Danielle A. Jimenez, # 10 Declaration of Madelon V. Baranoski, Ph.D. [Redacted], # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Declaration of R. Gil Kerlikowske, # 13 Declaration of Mark Y. Chen, # 14 Exhibit 5-20)(Chen, Mark) QC email, incorrect filer and hearing date and time was not requested (dlg). Modified on 7/18/2017 (dlg). (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1425MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chen, Mark) (aef). (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1426SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 25 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chen, Mark) (aef). (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1427SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 25 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chen, Mark) (aef). (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1728NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez . (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1729MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez, # 3 Exhibit 2-4, # 4 Declaration of Jane Doe [Redacted], # 5 Declaration of Leslie Itzel Ramirez Vega, # 6 Declaration of Jose Manuel Zarate, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Declaration of Kamylee G. Zarate, # 9 Declaration of Danielle A. Jimenez, # 10 Declaration of Madelon V. Baranoski, Ph.D [Redacted], # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Declaration of R. Gil Kerlikowske, # 13 Declaration of Mark Y. Chen, # 14 Exhibit 5-20)(Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-2130Defendants' ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint by John Kelly, United States Customs and Border Protection, Patricia McGurk, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Goldsmith, Aaron) (fth). (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2431ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Any opposition must be filed on or before 8/18/2017. Any reply shall be filed on or before 8/15/2017. A hearing is scheduled for 8/22/2017 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/24/2017.(fth) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2432Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10277436.) (Karanjia, Peter) (QC mailer sent re: Missing Signature) (kcm). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2433Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10277552.) (Brounell, Geoffrey) (kcm). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2434**DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 35 ** Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Mary Haas on behalf of United We Dream. (Haas, Mary) Modified on 7/26/2017 to withdraw document (fth). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2435NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by United We Dream re 34 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by United We Dream . (Haas, Mary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2436MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by United We Dream. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Brief)(Haas, Mary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2437Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10278024.) (Doran, Ambika) (kcm). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2638Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10277436.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Karanjia, Peter) (jrd) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-2739CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United We Dream re 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief , 35 Notice of Withdrawal of Document on July 24, 2017 (Haas, Mary) (fth). (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2840ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Geoffrey S. Brounell re 33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/26/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-2841ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ambika K. Doran re 37 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/26/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-3142ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Peter Karanjia re 38 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/27/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-0843RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0844NON Opposition re 25 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0845NON Opposition re 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0846CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Customs and Border Protection re 45 Non Opposition to Motion, 44 Non Opposition to Motion, 43 Response to Motion, (Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1547REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karen C. Tumlin, # 2 Exhibit 21-24)(Almadani, Monica) (aef). (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-2248Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2017 re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. Court directs parties to meet and confer on various issues. Motion Hearing continued to 8/23/17 at 12:30 pm. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Monica Ramirez Almandani and Nora Preciado).(Defendant Attorney AUSA Rebecca Grace Church; Aaron Goldsmith (USDOJ) and Amy Lynn Dell (USDOJ)).(Additional Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Chen; Karen Tumlin; Stacey Tolchin; Belinda Escobosa Helzer and Devon Mobley-Ritter). (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2249NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/22/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (akr) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2350Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2017 re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez; Court to issue Order. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Monica Ramirez Almandani and Nora Preciado). (Defendant Attorney AUSA Rebecca Grace Church; Aaron Goldsmith (USDOJ) and Amy Lynn Dell (USDOJ)). (Mark Chen; Karen Tumlin; Stacey Tolchin (appearing by phone); Belinda Escobosa Helzer and Devon Mobley-Ritter).(no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2451NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/23/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2017. (akr) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2852SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez Plaintiff's Proposal for Consolidated Hearing . (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-3153RESPONSE re 52 Supplemental Document filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-0554ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference re 52 and 53 . The Court sets a telephonic hearing on these proposals on Thursday, September 7, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate and coordinate the telephone call. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/5/17.(dlg) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-0755Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Miscellaneous Hearing (Telephonic) held on 9/7/2017; Court to issue Order.(Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Monica Ramirez Almandani; Nora Preciado; Stacey Tolchin; Mark Chen; Belinda Escobosa Helzer and Devon Mobley-Ritter). (Defendant Attorney AUSA Rebeca Grace Church; Aaron Goldsmith (USDOJ) and Nicole Grant). (no document attached) (ksr) Modified on 9/7/2017 to include additional attorney (ksr). (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0756NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/7/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2017. (akr) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0857ORDER Consolidating Preliminary Injunction Hearing With Trial on the Merits and Setting Discovery and Pretrial Schedule: Telephonic Case Management Conference on September 28, 2017 at 12 PM, Telephonic Case Management Conference on October 19, 2017 at 3:00 PM, Telephonic Case Management Conference on November 9, 2017 at 3:00 PM, Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by November 10, 2017, Proposed pre-trial conference order due November 22, 2017, Pre-trial conference on November 27, 2017 at 1:30 PM, Trial to begin December 4, 2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/7/17.(dlg) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1158SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Attachments: # 1 Redline of Second Amended Complaint) (Almadani, Monica) per attorney no summons requested (dlg). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1159Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 58 Amended Complaint by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez. (Almadani, Monica) (dlg). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1160ORDER Granting Joint 59 Motion Regarding Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff will file the Second Amended Complaint by September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/11/17. (dlg) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1361MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Elaine Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Patricia McGurk, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Goldsmith, Aaron) (dlg). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-1462ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendants may file a response or Answer to the Second Amended Complaint by September 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/13/17. (dlg) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1563NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Preciado, Nora) (dlg). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1564NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Juan Manuel Montes Bojorquez (Preciado, Nora) (dlg). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff