Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNation v. Shulkin et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv01402
Date Filed2017-04-20
Date Closed2017-06-14
JudgeJudge Timothy C. Batten, Sr
PlaintiffSamuel Nation et al
Case DescriptionSamuel Nation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for his claims file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after it failed to respond, Nation filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDavid Shulkin Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantMeghan Flanz General Counsel of the Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-201COMPLAINT, filed by Samuel Nation. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7100606.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-262NOTICE Of Filing by Samuel Nation (Nabors, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-05-263Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Meghan Flanz, David Shulkin. (Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-014ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Meghan Flanz Answer due 6/25/2017; David Shulkin Answer due 6/25/2017. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/1/17. (jlm) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-125MOTION to Dismiss by Samuel Nation. (Nabors, William) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-146ORDER granting 5 Pla's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/14/17. (rsh) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14Civil Case Terminated. (rsh) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff