Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLaRocca v. National Park Service
DistrictWestern District of North Carolina
CityAsheville
Case Number1:2017cv00112
Date Filed2017-04-21
Date Closed2017-11-09
JudgeDistrict Judge Martin Reidinger
PlaintiffLauren A. LaRocca
DefendantNational Park Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-211COMPLAINT against National Park Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number rec'd in AVL), filed by Lauren A. LaRocca. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(thh) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-212Summons Issued Conventionally as to National Park Service, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (thh) Modified text on 9/15/2017. (ejb) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-25Filing Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD041809 (bar) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-163SUMMONS Returned Executed National Park Service served on 5/2/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. (khm) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-014MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A&B)(Sullivan, James). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-065ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. National Park Service answer due 9/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/6/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-09-016MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by National Park Service. Responses due by 9/15/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sullivan, James). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-157Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Lauren A. LaRocca, Pro Se Pltf. (ejb) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-158MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: Deft's 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Lauren A. LaRocca. Counsel for Deft consents to requested extension. Deft's Response due by 9/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. (ejb) Motion referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-219ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall have until 10/16/2017 to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss 6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/21/2017. (khm) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-10-1310Consent MOTION to Stay by National Park Service. Responses due by 10/27/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Sullivan, James). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1311AMENDED DOCUMENT by National Park Service. correcting Certificate of Service (Sullivan, James) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-17TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay Text of Order: The Defendant's Consent Motion for Stay is GRANTED, and this matter is hereby STAYED. The parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal no later than December 22, 2017. So Ordered . Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/17/17. (LMR) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-11-0812STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by National Park Service (Sullivan, James) Modified text on 11/9/2017. (khm) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff