Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleORTIZ-MIRANDA v. CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00680
Date Filed2017-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffRAUL ORTIZ-MIRANDA
Case DescriptionRaul Ortiz-Miranda, a federal prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records about his conviction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after more than two years without a response, Ortiz-Miranda filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-171COMPLAINT against CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by RAUL ORTIZ-MIRANDA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-17SUMMONS Not Issued as to CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-172MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAUL ORTIZ-MIRANDA (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-173PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RAUL ORTIZ-MIRANDA (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-174ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $48.33 from Prison Account of Raul Ortiz-Miranda and granting; 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/11/2017. (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-05-055SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-157PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RAUL ORTIZ-MIRANDA (jf) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2017. (jf) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-06-158ANSWER to 1 Complaint by CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-279ORDER directing Defendant to file status report and proposed motions schedule by July 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/27/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report and motions schedule due by 7/21/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-2110STATUS REPORT by CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-24MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of Defendant's Status Report, ECF No. 10, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall continue to process Plaintiff's FOIA request and shall file a status report on September 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/24/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/5/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-09-0511STATUS REPORT by CRIMINAL DIVISON OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff