Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePalmer v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2017cv00699
Date Filed2017-05-03
Date Closed2017-08-28
JudgeJudge Michael W. Mosman
PlaintiffAnaiah E. Palmer
DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-031Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4998027 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Anaiah Elizabeth Palmer against U.S. Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet). (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-042Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/1/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/2/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 10/2/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-083Proposed Summons Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-124Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-165Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of State. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-256Affidavit of Service upon U.S. Department of State served on 5/19/2017 Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-06-057Return of Service Unexecuted as to U.S. Department of State. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-058Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-069Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of State. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-1510Affidavit of Service upon U.S. Department of State served on 6/15/2017 Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer. (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-1911Notice of Appearance of Sean E. Martin appearing on behalf of U.S. Department of State Filed by on behalf of U.S. Department of State (Martin, Sean) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2012First Amended Complaint . Filed by Anaiah E. Palmer against U.S. Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Attachment AUSA Written Consent to File Amended Complaint). (Gray, Amanda) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-0513Answer to 12 Amended Complaint, . Filed by U.S. Department of State. (Martin, Sean) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-08-2814Stipulation of Dismissal by U.S. Department of State. Filed by U.S. Department of State. (Martin, Sean) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff