Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWEST v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00789
Date Filed2017-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffARTHUR S. WEST
Case DescriptionArthur West submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the participation of Harvey Sweitzer in a hearing involving a private mining contest. The agency provided West some redacted records. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616084250) filed by ARTHUR S. WEST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Envelope, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-04-28SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-232GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/23/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-203NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-204ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 7/7/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/20/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-065Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER. Based upon the representations in the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule for briefing summary judgment is set in this matter: Defendants' motion is due on or before 9/1/2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion is due on or before 10/27/2017; Defendants' reply and cross-motion opposition is due on or before 11/24/2017; and Plaintiff's cross-motion reply is due on or before 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/06/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-316MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit Johnson Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-15Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff