Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWINN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00833
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffH. RICHARD WINN
Case DescriptionRichard Winn submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it had located 4000 pages of potentially responsive records. Winn told the agency he would like to receive the records on CD and would pay up to $115 in fees. The agency then told Winn that his request fell within the unusual circumstances exception and would be placed in the agency's backlog for processing. Winn submitted another request for records on himself and asked for a fee waiver since he planned to write a memoir of his career. The agency acknowledged that request as well, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Winn filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4941718) filed by H. RICHARD WINN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-05Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (jd) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-303RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2017. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/15/2017. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/15/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-166NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-167Unopposed MOTION to set Due Date for Answer (and Notice Regarding Service of Complaint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 defendant's unopposed motion to set due date to respond to the complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint by not later than July 17, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/16/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/17/2017. (zb) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-178ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-189ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than August 18, 2017. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/18/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule for dispositive motions due by 8/18/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-1810Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file further joint status reports by not later than October 4, 2017 and November 14, 2017, and, if necessary, propose a briefing schedule on remaining issues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/18/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file further Joint Status Reports by 10/4/2017 and 11/14/2017, and, if necessary, propose a briefing schedule on remaining issues. (jth) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff