Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. USDA APHIS Wildlife Services
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.1 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2017cv00197
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge B. Lynn Winmill
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
DefendantUSDA APHIS Wildlife Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1583166.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Brooks, Talasi)
2017-05-082Summons Issued as to USDA APHIS Wildlife Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
2017-05-083Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
2017-06-284SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Watersheds Project. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipts)(Brooks, Talasi)
2017-06-285AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brooks, Talasi)
2017-07-126ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by USDA APHIS Wildlife Services.(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2017-07-137NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for USDA APHIS Wildlife Services, Western Watersheds Project re 1 Complaint, 6 Answer to Amended Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/11/2017. (jp)
2017-07-148Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
2017-07-249LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2017 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 8/22/2017, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
2017-08-1810MOTION for Summary Judgment Talasi B Brooks appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 9/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Opening Brief, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Brooks Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 8-1, # 13 Exhibit 8-2, # 14 Exhibit 8-3, # 15 Exhibit 8-4, # 16 Exhibit 8-5, # 17 Exhibit 8-6, # 18 Exhibit 9, # 19 Exhibit 10, # 20 Exhibit 11, # 21 Exhibit 12, # 22 Exhibit 13, # 23 Exhibit 14, # 24 Exhibit 15, # 25 Exhibit 16, # 26 Exhibit 17, # 27 Exhibit 18, # 28 Exhibit 19, # 29 Exhibit 19-1, # 30 Exhibit 19-2, # 31 Exhibit 20, # 32 Exhibit 21, # 33 Exhibit 22, # 34 Exhibit 23, # 35 Exhibit 24)(Brooks, Talasi)
2017-08-2211NOTICE VACATING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2017. This hearing is VACATED. (cjs)
2017-08-2812DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment: A Motion Hearing is set for 11/1/2017 at 2:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jlb)
2017-09-0813RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USDA APHIS Wildlife Services. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tonya G. Woods, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2017-09-1114MOTION for Summary Judgment Joanne P Rodriguez appearing for Defendant USDA APHIS Wildlife Services. Responses due by 10/2/2017 (Rodriguez, Joanne)
2017-09-12The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
2017-09-1415AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding 10 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 14 Motion for Summary Judgment: The Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2017 at 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED to begin at 1:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (TIME CHANGE ONLY)(jlb)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff