Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDominguez v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2017cv02650
Date Filed2017-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
PlaintiffElijah Dominguez
Case DescriptionElijah Dominguez requested information from the FBI. He apparently was dissatisfied with the agency's response and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantCandice M. Will
DefendantMichelle Ann Jupina
DefendantStephen E. Richardson
DefendantLawrence D. Buckley
DefendantDerek Fischer
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-081COMPLAINT (no process) against Lawrence D. Buckley, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Derek Fischer, Michelle Ann Jupina, Stephen E. Richardson, Candice M. Will. Filed byElijah Dominguez. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elijah Dominguez. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-083Proposed Summons. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-084Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2017 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-235CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017). (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-076SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-197ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Issuance of summons and service will be determined separately. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-268THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017) Modified on 6/26/2017 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-319ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS 1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Objections due by 8/14/2017 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/31/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017). (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-3110ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-3111MOTION for Entry of Default as to Candice M. Will, Derek Fischer, Stephen E. Richardson, Lawrence D. Buckley, Michelle Ann Jupina filed by Elijah Dominguez. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-07-3112CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elijah Dominguez.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-0313Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Derek Fischer, Candice M. Will, Michelle Ann Jupina, Stephen E. Richardson, and Lawrence D. Buckley. (Related documents(s) 11 )(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0314CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 13 Clerk's Declination of Default (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0715CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 10/23/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-2116ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND for 9 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/221/17. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-1817MOTION to Continue Amended Report; (Proposed) Order filed by Elijah Dominguez. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff