Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWU v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00847
Date Filed2017-05-08
Date Closed2017-08-08
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffLULU WU
Case DescriptionLulu Wu submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records about herself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wu filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by LULU WU. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-11Filing fee Paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 4616084484. (md) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-112STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/11/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-094NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-07-065Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 5 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before July 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/12/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-126Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/12/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 8/14/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-08-077NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LULU WU (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/8/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff