Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, et al.,
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01057
Date Filed2017-06-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffSOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionThe Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between the agency and attorneys or representatives of the litigants in Wyoming v. Jewell. The Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance submitted two more FOIA requests to the agency for communications with attorneys involved in several other named cases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-021COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4975021) filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Pilsk, William) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/5/2017) (jf). (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-022REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO CHANNING D. PHILLIPS re 1 Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.(Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-023REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO JEFF SESSIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.(Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-024STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/2/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-025SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-056Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-147AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 2, and 3, # 2 Summons Channing D. Phillips, # 3 Summons Jeff Sessions, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice, # 5 Summons US Department of the Interior, # 6 Summons Bureau of Land Management)(Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-168SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-299MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lori Potter, :Firm- Kaplan Kirsch & Rockwell LLP, :Address- 1675 Broadway Ste 2300, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 825-7000. Fax No. - (303) 825-7005 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5012255. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lori Potter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lori Potter)(Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-2910MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathaniel Hunt, :Firm- Kaplan Kirsch & Rockwell LLP, :Address- 1675 Broadway Ste 2300, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 825-7000. Fax No. - (303) 825-7005 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5012265. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathaniel Hunt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel Hunt)(Pilsk, William) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lori Potter 9 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Lori Potter is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel Hunt 10 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Nathaniel Hunt is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-1711ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE re 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 7 Amended Complaint, 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, 4 Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Service)(Hunt, Nathaniel) Modified on 7/18/2017 (ztd). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Certificate of Service; emailed to nhunt@kaplankirsch.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Refile using the proper event(s) listed under Initial Pleadings and Service then select Service of Process, then use the relief for Summons Returned Executed. (ztd, ) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 11 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (ztd) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1912RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1913RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/21/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1914RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1915RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1916RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-2117NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2118ENTERED IN ERROR..... ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified on 7/24/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2119ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Answer to Amended Complaint))(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified event title and link on 7/24/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 18 Answer to Amended Complaint was entered in error (incorrect document attached) and was refiled as Docket Entry 19 Notice; Docket Entry 19 has been amended to reflect that it is an Answer. (znmw) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-25MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on August 4, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., to discuss the next steps of the litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/25/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference scheduled for 8/4/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (tg) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-2820NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Shana Saltman on behalf of All Defendants (Saltman, Julie) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-0321MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 8/4/2017. The 21 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Department of the Interior shall provide it's initial response within sixty (60) days of today's date, and every thirty (30) days thereafter, on a rolling basis. The parties shall file a joint status report sixty (60) days from today's date, and every thirty (30) days thereafter. Plaintiff granted leave to file an appropriate motion, with supporting authority, to substantiate their proposition that Defendants are not proceeding fast enough in production of documents, or as to the issue of a more expeditious relief. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0422Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.(td) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-10-0223NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jason Lee on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Julie S. Saltman (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0324Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0425Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, nunc pro tunc 25 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before October 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/5/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before 10/11/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-1126ANSWER to 22 Amended Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-0227Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-12-0128Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Second Amended Complaint 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-0429Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-0430SUPPLEMENT to Second Amended Complaint to re 22 Amended Complaint filed by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (td) Modified on 12/6/2017 (td). (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-1831ANSWER to Complaint re 30 Supplemental Second Amended Complaint) by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Lee, Jason) Modified on 12/20/2017 to add docket link (jf). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-0332Joint STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of 32 Fourth Joint Status Report, the parties' next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before February 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 3, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-02-2333Joint STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-27MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 33 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with proposed briefing schedule if necessary, on or before March 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 27, 2018. (MJS) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2018. (kh) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-2034Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with proposed briefing schedule if necessary, on or before April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 2, 2018. (MJS) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/20/2018. (jl) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-1935(Seventh) Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) Modified to add "seventh" on 4/23/2018 (td). (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 35 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with proposed briefing schedule if necessary, on or before May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 19, 2018. (MJS) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/21/2018. (jl) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-2136Joint STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 22, 2018. (MJS) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/21/2018. (jl) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-2137(Ninth) Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) Modified to add "ninth" on 6/22/2018 (tth). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 37 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 21, 2018. (MJS) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/20/2018. (jl) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-1938Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 38 Tenth Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that another joint status report shall be filed on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 19, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-1739Joint STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Hunt, Nathaniel) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 39 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 17, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-2040Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 40 Twelth Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that another joint status report shall be filed on or before October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 1, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-2241Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report on or before November 20, 2018 in accordance with the parties' 41 Thirteenth Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 22, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-1942Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar