Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMaanao v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2017cv00870
Date Filed2017-06-04
Date Closed2017-11-01
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffJesse Maanao
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-051Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5030517. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Jesse Maanao against USCIS (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (ecp) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-052Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 10/3/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/2/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 11/2/2017. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-053Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-214Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 1 . Filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Martin, Sean) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-225ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 4 . Answer is due by 9/8/2017. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-08-256Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 1 . Filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Martin, Sean) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-287Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 9/1/2017 at 01:30PM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-018MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held regarding Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition 6 . Status of case discussed as stated on the record. ORDER: Case STAYED. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/1/2017 at 11:00AM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Jesse S.T. Maanao present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sean E. Martin present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-11-019MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held. Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Defendant's unopposed oral motion to dismiss this case is GRANTED. Jesse S.T. Maanao present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sean E. Martin present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff