Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVISALDEN v. SPEER
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01077
Date Filed2017-06-06
Date Closed2018-01-17
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffLUIS VISALDEN
Case DescriptionLuis Visalden submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of the Army for records concerning a report of investigation. The agency withheld a military police report and a law enforcement report under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Visalden filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either the appeal or his two subsequent requests, Visalden filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantROBERT M. SPEER Acting Secretary of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-061COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO OBTAIN FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT (FOIA) INFORMATION against ROBERT M. SPEER in his official capacity as ACTING SECRETARY OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4979015) filed by LUIS VISALDEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant Acting Army Secretary Robert M. Speer, # 3 Summons for courtesy service to the US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for courtesy service to the US Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Klimaski, James) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-062STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to ROBERT M. SPEER, non-party U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (INCORRECT SUMMONS WERE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. FOIA SUMMONS NEED TO BE SUBMITTED.) (md) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-083REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for service to Defendant Acting Secretary of the Army Robert M. Speer (pursuant to the Court's request for the special FOIA summonses) re 1 Complaint,, filed by LUIS VISALDEN. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by LUIS VISALDEN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for courtesy service to the Attorney-General, # 2 Summons for courtesy service to the U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Klimaski, James) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-094SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to ROBERT M. SPEER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/16/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2017. (Klimaski, James) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/16/2017. (Klimaski, James) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-267NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna Laura Cronin on behalf of All Defendants (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-138MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, , MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ROBERT M. SPEER (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before August 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/14/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/11/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-179RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT M. SPEER served on 6/28/2017 (Klimaski, James) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-08-1110ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT M. SPEER.(Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on August 22, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/11/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1111Consent MOTION to Continue Reschedule Confer and Status Conference by ROBERT M. SPEER (Cronin, Shanna) Modified event title on 8/14/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/22/17 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kk) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Reschedule Status Conference 11 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the status conference currently set for August 22, 2017, be VACATED and RESCHEDULED for September 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/11/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-14Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 9/6/2017, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 9/6/2017. A further Status Conference is set for 10/6/2017, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-10-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/6/2017. Defense counsel will confer with Defendant regarding outstanding issues/search for second investigation report. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 10/30/2017 to update the Court and outline their proposals for going forward. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-3012Joint STATUS REPORT by ROBERT M. SPEER. (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-3013MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Status Report by ROBERT M. SPEER, LUIS VISALDEN. (See Docket Entry 12 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-03MINUTE ORDER: As requested by the parties in their Joint Status Report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 1, 2017, indicating whether any further issues remain to be litigated. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/3/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017. (kt) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-12-0114Joint STATUS REPORT by ROBERT M. SPEER. (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER: As requested by the parties in their Joint Status Report 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 15, 2018, indicating whether an agreement has been reached as to attorney's fees and costs, or if not, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2018-01-1615STIPULATION of Settlement (Joint) by ROBERT M. SPEER. (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1716ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Settlement 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED pursuant to the terms of the attached stipulation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/17/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff