Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01187
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-06-26
JudgeJudge Dana M. Sabraw
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Pacific Regional Office for records concerning two 1928 California Indian blanket applications. The agency disclosed 178 documents in part and withheld 95 documents entirely. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1187-DMS-BGS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(fth) (sjt). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (fth) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-263ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and (2) Dismissing Complaint without Prejudice for Failing to State a Claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP is granted. The Court sua sponte dismisses the Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (sjt). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-264CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP is granted. The Court sua sponte dismisses the Complaint without prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)(sjt). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff