Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01193
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-07-17
JudgeJudge Michael M. Anello
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Southern California Agency for records concerning determinations pertaining to several named individuals' San Pasqual applications. The agency disclosed 10 redacted documents. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency, IFP Filed. Filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1193-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(sjt) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (sjt) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-143ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee within fourteen days of this Order, or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-07-174NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) Modified on 7/17/2017 to note that no proposed low number order was prepared; case closed (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-175ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/17/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff