Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01188
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-07-14
JudgeJudge Roger T. Benitez
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Pacific Regional Office for records concerning two 1928 California Indian blanket applications. The agency withheld 12 documents in full. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1188-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(fth) (sjt). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (fth) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-07-143ORDER Denying in Forma Pauperis Application. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and may be re-opened if Plaintiff pays the required filing fee within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff