Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Western Regional Office
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01192
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2018-01-05
JudgeJudge John A. Houston
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Southern California Agency for records concerning the agency's response to several San Pasqual applications. The agency disclosed nine documents with redactions. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Western Regional Office
DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1192-JLS-JMA. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case.(dxj) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (dxj) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-203ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (2) Directing Service. It is ordered that the Court grants Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP. The Court Orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff on the USM Form 285s provided to him. All costs of that service will be advanced by the United States. Orders Defendants, once they have been served, to reply to Plaintiff's Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). See 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2). Orders Plaintiff, after service has been effected by the U.S. Marshal, to serve upon each Defendant, or if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Defendants' counsel, a copy of every further pleading, motion, or other document submitted for the Courts consideration pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 (b). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-204Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Letter)(IFP Packet Mailed)(dxj) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-235Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (dxj) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-306ORDER Sua Sponte Consolidating Cases: (1) 17cv1191-JLS-KSC, (2) 17cv1192-JLS-JMA, (3) 17cv1195-JLS-MDD; and Designating 17cv1191-JLS-KSC as Lead Case. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/30/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-309MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv1192-JLS-KSC..(no document attached) (dxj) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-107SUMMONS Returned Executed (USM-285) by Emilio Reyes. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency served. (fth) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-138SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency served. (dxj) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1710NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) QC Mailer re: Should only file in Lead Case (dxj). LNO prepared(jao). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-08-2111Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon Signed by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: First Amended Complaint, from Plaintiff Emilio Reyes. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing Proof of Service, OTHER: Per docket order 6: All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2212ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:17-cv-01190-JAH-RBB. The new case number is 17cv1192-JAH-RBB. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/22/2017. Signed by Judge John Houston on 8/18/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-0713NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/20/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/07/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-12-2014MINUTE ORDER - A settlement conference was held. The parties advised the Court that case 17cv1192-JAH(RBB) has settled. Accordingly, the Court sets a telephonic attorneys-only settlement disposition conference in 17cv1192-JAH(RBB) for January 23, 2018, at 8:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Brooks. Signed by Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 12/20/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-0515ORDER granting Joint Motion (in lead case 17CV1191-JAH(RBB) to dismiss member case 17CV1192-JAH(RBB) without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/05/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff