Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01195
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Janis L. Sammartino
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Southern California Agency for records concerning enrollment applications for a named individual. The agency withheld two documents in full. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1195-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Reyes, Emilio)(lrf) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (lrf) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-203ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (2) Directing Service. It is ordered that the Court grants Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP. The Court Orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff on the USM Form 285s provided to him. All costs of that service will be advanced by the United States. Orders Defendants, once they have been served, to reply to Plaintiff's Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). See 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2). Orders Plaintiff, after service has been effected by the U.S. Marshal, to serve upon each Defendant, or if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Defendants' counsel, a copy of every further pleading, motion, or other document submitted for the Courts consideration pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 ( b). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-204Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Letter)(IFP Packet Mailed)(dxj) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-305ORDER Sua Sponte Consolidating Cases: (1) 17cv1191-JLS-KSC, (2) 17cv1192-JLS-JMA, (3) 17cv1195-JLS-MDD; and Designating 17cv1191-JLS-KSC as Lead Case. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-307MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv1195-JLS-KSC.(no document attached) (dxj) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-106SUMMONS Returned Executed (USM-285) by Emilio Reyes. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency served. (fth) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-178NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) QC Mailer re: Should only file in Lead Case (dxj). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff