Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBARTON et al v. U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01188
Date Filed2017-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffANNE BARTON
PlaintiffCAROL GRUNEWALD
PlaintiffMARY ROWSE
Case DescriptionAnne Barton, Carol Grunewald, and Mary Rowse submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior and the U.S. Geological Survey for records concerning the reasons for killing deer in Rock Creek Park to encourage the regeneration of the forest. The USGS withheld more than 2500 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). The requesters filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Barton, Grunewald, and Rowse filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
Defendant2255
UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
12201 Sunrise Valley Dr
Reston, VA 20192
2255
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
U.S. Department of the Interior
1849 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-161COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4994647) filed by ANNE BARTON, MARY ROWSE, CAROL GRUNEWALD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USGS Summons, # 3 Summons DOI Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons US Atty Summons)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-162MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth L. Lewis, :Firm- Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks LLP, :Address- 4115 Wisconsin Ave NW, Ste 210, Washington DC 20016. Phone No. - 202-588-5206. Fax No. - 202-588-5049 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4994673. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANNE BARTON, CAROL GRUNEWALD, MARY ROWSE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Elizabeth Lewis PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sb) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-193REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by ANNE BARTON, MARY ROWSE, CAROL GRUNEWALD. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ANNE BARTON, MARY ROWSE, CAROL GRUNEWALD. (Attachments: # 1 Summons USGS Summons, # 2 Summons DOI Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave of Elizabeth L. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-204SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/30/2017; U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY served on 6/28/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/7/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/6/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/03/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Scanned Return Receipts)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-016NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before September 5, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/2/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-09-058STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-05MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall advise the Court by September 7, 2017, if they object to the proposed schedule set forth in defendants' 8 status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/5/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-079RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Set Deadlines Response to Defendants' Status Report filed by ANNE BARTON, CAROL GRUNEWALD, MARY ROWSE. (Lewis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER. Defendants shall complete their re-review of the production by October 20, 2017, and the parties shall submit a joint status report by that date to update the Court on the status of the matter and to propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/7/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-10-1910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by December 11, 2017, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (tg) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-12-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-14MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that defendants shall file its motion for summary judgment by February 14, 2018. Plaintiffs' opposition (and cross motion, if any, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities) will be due March 14, 2018. Defendants' reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary) will be due April 13, 2018. Plaintiffs' cross reply, if any, will be due April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff