Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCASEY v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01108
Date Filed2017-05-30
Date Closed2017-06-19
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffBRIAN M. CASEY
Case DescriptionBrian Casey, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's investigation of his taxes and those of his company. After the agency failed to respond, Casey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantCAROL PRIM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-30Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/30/2017. (sb) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-05-301COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CAROL PRIM filed by BRIAN M. CASEY.(sb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zsb). (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-05-302MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN M. CASEY (sb) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-05-303PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by BRIAN M. CASEY (sb) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-194MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 06/15/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-195ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). This is a final appealable Order. The Court certifies pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this Order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 06/15/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff