Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOORE v. U.S. JUSTICE DEPARTMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01122
Date Filed2017-06-02
Date Closed2017-07-19
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffSURF MOORE
DefendantU.S. JUSTICE DEPARTMENT
DefendantFOIA AGENCY
DefendantC.F. MOORE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-02Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/2/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-021COMPLAINT against C.F. MOORE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, FOIA AGENCY, U.S. JUSTICE DEPARTMENT filed by SURF MOORE.(sth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zsth). (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-022MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SURF MOORE (sth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-07-193ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/19/17. (sth) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff