Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleQUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01266
Date Filed2017-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffQUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.
Case DescriptionQuality Control Systems submitted a FOIA request to the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration for records concerning the closing of an investigation of Tesla's mileage and airbag deployment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Quality Control Systems that it would provide an interim response and would also take a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Quality Control Systems filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-281COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5010131) filed by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 certificate, # 3 Summons DOT, # 4 Summons Att'y General, # 5 Summons U.S. Att'y)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. (md) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-28Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-284STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 28, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-185NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-026Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other response by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by August 22, 2017, answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 2, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/22/2017. (tg) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-227ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-09-088Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Scheduling Order, Instanter by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order, Instanter nunc pro tunc. Accordingly, the Court issues the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) the defendant shall, by October 16, 2017, file any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall, by November 20, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall, by December 18, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall, by January 19, 2018, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 10/16/2017; plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2017; defendant's Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/18/2017; Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 1/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-10-169Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion and extend briefing schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the Court issues the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) the defendant shall, by October 25, 2017, file any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall, by November 30, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall, by December 27, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall, by January 29, 2018, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/25/2017; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2017; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/27/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 1/29/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-2510MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9 (Referenced in Exhibit A and Exhibit B), # 2 Declaration (Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Quant), # 3 Declaration (Exhibit B - Declaration of Otto G. Matheke, III), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-2911Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall A. Whitfield, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Statement of Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-2912Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall A. Whitfield, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Statement of Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-2713Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex.A- Matheke Supp. Decl., # 2 Declaration Ex.B-Schwall Decl., # 3 Statement of Facts Statement addressing Pl. SMF and Supp. Statement of Def., # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-2714REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff