Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNiro et al v. United States et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityWorcester
Case Number4:2017cv40099
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Timothy S. Hillman
PlaintiffDonato F. Niro
PlaintiffShirley M. Niro
DefendantUnited States
DefendantDepartment of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donato F. Niro, Shirley M. Niro. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-262ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-263Summons Issued as to Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-264General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-215SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Donato F. Niro, Shirley M. Niro. Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 7/5/2017, answer due 9/5/2017; United States served on 7/5/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-026NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States (Johnson, Anita) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-037Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 3, 2017 to File an Answer by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Anita) Modified on 8/4/2017 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-088NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Hoffman-Logsdon on behalf of Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service (Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-099District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-2910MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/19/2017 to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service.(Johnson, Anita) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-10-0611District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service answer due 10/19/2017; United States answer due 10/19/2017. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-1212Letter (non-motion) regarding IRS answer from Donato Niro. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1913ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service.(Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-2614MOTION to begin proceeding by Donato F. Niro, Shirley M. Niro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-0915RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION to begin proceeding filed by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States. (Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-1316District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 14 Motion. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court on or before 1/20/18. The status report shall include a proposed briefing schedule and state whether a further status conference will be required. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1517MOTION to produce witnesses by Donato F. Niro, Shirley M. Niro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-2918Opposition re 17 MOTION to produce witnesses filed by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff