Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHernandez v. United States of America
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2017cv00732
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date Closed2017-12-07
JudgeDistrict Judge Leonie M. Brinkema
PlaintiffRemberto Hernandez
DefendantInternal Revenue Service Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5589633.), filed by Remberto Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 6-1, # 8 Exhibit 6-2, # 9 Exhibit 6-3, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 8-1, # 13 Exhibit 8-2, # 14 Exhibit 8-3, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 9-2, # 17 Exhibit 10, # 18 Exhibit 11, # 19 Exhibit 12, # 20 Exhibit 12-1, # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 15-1, # 25 Exhibit 15-2, # 26 Exhibit 16, # 27 Exhibit 17, # 28 Exhibit 18, # 29 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-10-022ORDER- it is hereby ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days the plaintiff show cause, if any, why this civil action should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/2/2017. (dest, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-103Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,, by Remberto Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons, # 2 Supplement Summons, # 3 Supplement Summons)(Kellogg, Mark) ( Filed in Error and Removed (dest, ). (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-114Proposed Summons by Remberto Hernandez. (Kellogg, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-115Proposed Summons by Remberto Hernandez. (Kellogg, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-116Proposed Summons by Remberto Hernandez. (Kellogg, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-127Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service Commissioner of Internal Revenue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dest, ) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-138MOTION by Remberto Hernandez. (Kellogg, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1310SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 10/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (dest, ) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-169ORDER granting 8 Motion to extend time. the Court finds that plaintiff has established good cause for his failure to serve defendant within 90 days of filing the Complaint. Accordingly, plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time 8 is GRANTED; and it is hereby ORDERED that within thirty (30) days plaintiff file a proof of service to confirm that he properly served defendant on October 13, 2017. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/16/2017. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-12-0711NOTICE by Remberto Hernandez (Kellogg, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0712Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/7/17. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff