Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMESSINA LAW FIRM, P.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2017cv04937
Date Filed2017-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael A. Shipp
PlaintiffMESSINA LAW FIRM, P.C. a New Jersey Professional Corporation
Case DescriptionThe Messina Law Firm submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning a lawsuit filed in New York against Facebook. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Messina Law Firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7944628), filed by MESSINA LAW FIRM, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(MESSINA, GIL) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by MESSINA LAW FIRM, P.C.. (MESSINA, GIL) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jjc) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-063SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-074SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *Gina Hernandez-Buckley* (gxh) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-075CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MESSINA LAW FIRM, P.C. (MESSINA, GIL) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-08-096NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCES C. BAJADA on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (BAJADA, FRANCES) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-097Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BAJADA, FRANCES) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-11Clerk`s Text Order - The document 7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/25/2017. (mps) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-258ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(BAJADA, FRANCES) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-149TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 10/6/17 at 9:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/14/17. (if, ) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-10-1310TEXT ORDER directing counsel to report by joint letter by no later than 12/1/17 as to the status of dispute or whether dispositive motions should be scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/13/17. (if, ) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-12-0111STATUS REPORT Jointly, by Defendant and by All Plaintiffs. (MESSINA, GIL) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff