Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCDADE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01334
Date Filed2017-07-06
Date Closed2017-12-18
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffMICHAEL MCDADE
Case DescriptionMichael McDade, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his criminal prosecution. The Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, McDade filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-061COMPLAINT against Michael McDade ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5020714) filed by Michael McDade. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Gordon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-103STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/10/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Gordon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/13/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/12/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Gordon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Gordon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-267NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-268Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/26/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/11/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-09-079Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration John W. Kornmeier)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 9 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/8/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 10/11/2017. (kt) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-15Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-10-1110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 10/11/2017, that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants shall have up to and including October 20, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/12/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/20/2017. (kh) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-2511Consent MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-26MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint by November 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/26/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/8/2017. (kh) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-0812Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-08MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint by November 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/8/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/29/2017. (kh) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-2913ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/30/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3014NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Creighton Sample on behalf of MICHAEL MCDADE (Sample, Brandon) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-1415STIPULATION of Dismissal by MICHAEL MCDADE. (Gordon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff