Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWright v. Tennessee Department of Health Office of Vital Records
DistrictWestern District of Tennessee
CityMemphis
Case Number2:2017cv02464
Date Filed2017-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John T. Fowlkes, Jr
PlaintiffJeffrey Lauren Wright
DefendantTennessee Department of Health Office of Vital Records
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-032Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Lauren Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents)(csf) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-033NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-034NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-035NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-066ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Pro Se Complaint, filed by Jeffrey Lauren Wright ( Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 7/6/2017. (Claxton, Charmiane) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-197Pro Se NOTICE of Letter of Dispute and Request for Reconsideration for in Forma Pauperis by Jeffrey Lauren Wright (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jld) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff